This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:35:37 (UTC).

NCS Multistage Inc. v. INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 NCS Multistage Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCS Multistage Inc.

Defendant

INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Andrew K. Fletcher

Attorney at Blank Rome, LLP

Union Trust Building, 501 Grant Street, Suite 850

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Munira A. Jesani

Attorney at Blank Rome, LLP

717 Texas Avemie. Siote 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew William Cornelia

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

2000 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75214

Tyler T. VanHoutan

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

Eric Stephen Schlichter

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

600 Travis St., Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) by INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice application for Munira A. Jesani

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo Manuel Llagostera for Munira A. Jesani, Blank Rome LLP, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13549623) by on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice application for Munira A. Jesani)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

15 #1

Document granting Pro Hac Vice application for Andrew Fletcher

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo Manuel Llagostera for Andrew K. Fletcher, Blank Rome LLP, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13549578) by on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 proposed order granting Pro Hac Vice application for Andrew Fletcher)(Llagostera, Domingo) Modified text for proposed order on 5/8/2020 (tr). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#14

(#14) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,. (Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including June 1, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. to Innovex Downhole Solutions,Inc (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

3 #1

Patent/TM standing order

#3

(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 Patent/TM standing order) (lad) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet JS 44

1 #2

Exhibit B_Innovex_Infringement Claim Chart_445 Patent_Gen 1

1 #1

Exhibit A_ '445 Patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Innovex Downhole Solutions, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13440693). No Summons requested at this time, filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_ '445 Patent, #2 Exhibit B_Innovex_Infringement Claim Chart_445 Patent_Gen 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC., answer due 6/16/2020. (am) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including June 16, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) by INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 05/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo Manuel Llagostera for Munira A. Jesani, Blank Rome LLP, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13549623) by on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Pro Hac Vice application for Munira A. Jesani)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo Manuel Llagostera for Andrew K. Fletcher, Blank Rome LLP, ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13549578) by on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 proposed order granting Pro Hac Vice application for Andrew Fletcher)(Llagostera, Domingo) Modified text for proposed order on 5/8/2020 (tr). (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC., answer due 6/1/2020. (mc5) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including June 1, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,. (Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler T. VanHoutan on behalf of INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,. Attorney Tyler T. VanHoutan added to party INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC.,(pty:dft) (VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage Inc.. INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC., served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell T. Wong on behalf of NCS Multistage Inc.. Attorney Russell T. Wong added to party NCS Multistage Inc.(pty:pla) (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (lad) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. to Innovex Downhole Solutions,Inc (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 Patent/TM standing order) (lad) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Innovex Downhole Solutions, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13440693). No Summons requested at this time, filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_ '445 Patent, #2 Exhibit B_Innovex_Infringement Claim Chart_445 Patent_Gen 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INNOVEX DOWNHOLE SOLUTIONS, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell T. Wong