This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 09:07:51 (UTC).

NCS Multistage, Inc. v. Allamon Tool Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 NCS Multistage, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Allamon Tool Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00699

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCS Multistage, Inc.

Defendant

Allamon Tool Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NCS Multistage, Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage, Inc.. Allamon Tool Company, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Allamon Tool Company, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by NCS Multistage, Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage, Inc.. as to Allamon Tool Company, Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2020) (lad). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet ccs

1 #1

Exhibit A_ Pat. 10,465,445 B2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allamon Tool Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13816058), filed by NCS Multistage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_ Pat. 10,465,445 B2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ccs)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NCS Multistage, Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage, Inc.. Allamon Tool Company, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Allamon Tool Company, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by NCS Multistage, Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage, Inc.. as to Allamon Tool Company, Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2020) (lad). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allamon Tool Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13816058), filed by NCS Multistage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_ Pat. 10,465,445 B2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet ccs)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant