This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2021 at 08:26:10 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 NBA Properties, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05521

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NBA Properties, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Hipster hip-hop Store

PiZhouShiShengZhiTaiDianYingYuan

Sandra T Poe

FAN GUI DA

KKAA

XWLIN

ZQQ-QUNZHONGDIAN

zhangguixian

huierer

Qin Youjiao441

DFSVG

tianbeidoushangmao

Fans shop 2021

point link

Yu Jungui's shop

JTGJ-US

MiguelDane

ZhonCai

198 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/22/2021. Emailed notice(cdh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Defendants did not appear. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Signed Order to follow. A further hearing is set for 1/14/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #33 will be heard telephonically on 11/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

36 #1

Declaration of Jake M. Christensen

#36

(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NBA Properties, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/22/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

34 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#34

(#34) MEMORANDUM by NBA Properties, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#33

(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Hipster hip-hop Store, PiZhouShiShengZhiTaiDianYingYuan, Sandra T Poe, FAN GUI DA, KKAA, XWLIN, ZQQ-QUNZHONGDIAN, zhangguixian, huierer, Qin Youjiao441, DFSVG, tianbeidoushangmao, Fans shop 2021, point link, Yu Jungui's shop, JTGJ-US, MiguelDane, ZhonCai, WJKFDC, YIHONGSHOP, JYE Store, gfjhegsfbujwe, CMKJUS, LinHangMaoYi, YAYASB, WWDUS, hehehehhahaha, LWZRR, taiyuanshixiaodianquhuachentongxunqicaijingxiaobu, Robin S Garza, huydgfhfghs, ZZ-BEST, Liu Na Si, LIANCHEN, WeiFangJiuDingQiYeGuanLiZiXunZhongXin, JIANZH, Fans Jersey 444, ZBXM, seloothlgur, Lucntos, Haizi Biological Engineering, LianJiangShiZhiYueDianQiYouXianGongSi, Wanfsg Hfdsui, LeticiaxsxjK, yunnianghe, xuan xuejian, manhjatgdfndolin, XinDongDa, PENGC, Guorpines, DLYCMY, Jinpai Education, GO! Play 2021, Weidlis, lkljujthygje, NEPKODCN, jifuhongmaoyi, LLc store, Lihua Department Store, xiangshangvole, uszhangguimei, ZJLUKZ, Fans shop 443, Super YM Store, LZMUS, Chuangte, samring, ManLun, qingbu, Youyuan HSBC, guanxianyangguofumalatangdianlixiaoqin, CL1949, RenWeiFeng, Michael Ortega, mvo427, nett5263, lzky432, nsanton633, PaqiangzhongtI, TongkebodJu, XianbencanuE, ShixingjingzB, XunrongyuanweitO, MilujudNu, HuanbijiangyounRj, CibozhongkCy, laseloec, rlene5468, ious4588, oeada485, nlorandrt89, NohemiPratt, MarkCross, SandyAbrams, SarahGoldberg, HubertRowe jr., RachelOster, Henry ooi, Theresssadas, slobodankurtesevic, Paula Baragaryy, Katelyn Lambertt, Stephanie Kamp, RaeLee Eylicioo, Kelirae Terry, Jameslke, Jessiscodne, Kiyanmo9, Marktho28, Michj287D, JAY PAOLO LABAWIG, VILLEGAS GRACE GOMEZ, Lisa McAlpin, Margherita Bonazzi, Tracey Ralston, wadetienda, Joan Duncan, Trifecta Lei Cao, Olaq, Wendy Daniel, Virginia Goulet, Luz Silva1, Vickie Colson1, Serryna Gonzalez1, Jack Hawkins2, NANpro, lgrey, Kent Bennett, Ted Pepys, Hilda FitzGerald, trachyte, Todd'S shop, Qytecuygihuno, Kevinlmu, mytuutt, LINUMOSE, Lester David, Hitherto, ballin202, Oceanuscenter, JamesColorwaysSplit, cgg-2021, gdblvh, leeho-65, manhndx, yangxiaojd22, zheton-38, goodjerseywholesale.ru, highclassbadass.com, izsulsport.com, jerseyhills.com, juicyjerseys.com, prudentsport.store, scfifa.com, thundersgear.com, nbaapparel.us.org, nbaclothesstore.com, nbafanjersey.org, nbajerseysport.com, nbajerseyssale2021.com, nbajerseysshop2021.com, nbaplayersjersey.com, nbasalejersey.net, nbasalejersey.org, nbasalejerseys.com, nbashop2021.com, nbashortsusa.com, nibasun.com, aafkuv.top, aardhg.top, airmaskn95.com, bbdehg.xyz, bbdfov.xyz, bbdpoe.best, bbfprt.top, bbhder.xyz, bbmadu.best, bbpasd.xyz, bbphrk.best, bbpqar.best, bbqcok.best, bbqemg.best, bbqvgd.best, bbqyed.best, bbsbew.best, bbsmwu.best, bbteas.top, bbtovb.xyz, bbycde.shop, bbyjup.xyz, bbyoyz.xyz, celticsjerseys.net, cheapjerseysmall.com, cheapnbajerseys2022.com, esaltuning.com, gaokv.com, iloveforeverfashion.com, jersey.la, jerseyscheap2022.com, jerseysfamily.com, jerseysnflusa.com, kickingarea.com, kobesjersey.com, lakersblackjersey.com, luekete.top, myjersey.shop, ouhongstore.com, pickmynba.com, qsknba.best, ringforchampions.com, ringofchamp.com, shopjf.net, stevezstore.com, vaperdes.com, vattolob.com and xyzclubs.com added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/22/2021. Emailed notice(cdh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Defendants did not appear. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Signed Order to follow. A further hearing is set for 1/14/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #33 will be heard telephonically on 11/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NBA Properties, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/22/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM by NBA Properties, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY Restraining Order: Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/8/2021. Mailed notice. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (ey, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (cp, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/23/2021 (bg, ). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by NBA Properties, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18778055. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Crout Ziegler