This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2021 at 07:52:40 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Inc. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 NBA Properties, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01594

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Regents of the University of California

NHL Enterprises, L.P.

NFL Properties LLC

Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC

MLB Advanced Media, L.P.

NBA Properties, Inc.

Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#47

#46

45 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#45

#44

#43

#40

RESTRICTED

#42

RESTRICTED

#10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #44 is granted. The temporary restraining order is extended through 6/1/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #44 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MEMORANDUM by NBA Properties, Inc. in support of extension of time #44 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by NBA Properties, Inc. (Document not imaged) (td, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 29, 2021 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Order Number: 40449. Court Reporter Contact Information: Annette Montalvo, annette.montalvo@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2021. (Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/4/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the domain names, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #10 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.4(f)(3) #24 is granted. Enter Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic status hearing set for 5/18/21 at 9:30 a.m. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. Revised Exhibit 2 regarding declaration #13 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff NBA Properties, Inc. Revised Exhibit 1 - Parts 1-9 regarding declaration #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 1-6, #7 Exhibit 1-7, #8 Exhibit 1-8, #9 Exhibit 1-9)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (nsf, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., The Regents of the University of California, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18049391. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Major League Baseball Properties, Inc. is a litigant