This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2021 at 07:18:01 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Inc. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 NBA Properties, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07543

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Regents of the University of California

NHL Enterprises, L.P.

NFL Properties LLC

Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC

MLB Advanced Media, L.P.

NBA Properties, Inc.

Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Smootbiso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

45 #1

Declaration of Jake M. Christensen

#45

#44

43 #2

Exhibit 1

43 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#43

#42

#41

#40

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., The Regents of the University of California, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California re MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California for preliminary injun #42 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MEMORANDUM by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California in support of motion for preliminary injunction, #42 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (jg, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 1/26/2021. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's Motion to extend the temporary restraining order #35 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California, receipt #4624251671 (kl, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., The Regents of the University of California Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., The Regents of the University of California, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17759892. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NHL Enterprises, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant