This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 08:23:50 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Inc. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 NBA Properties, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05540

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NHL Enterprises, L.P.

NFL Properties LLC

Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC

MLB Advanced Media, L.P.

NBA Properties, Inc.

THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC.

Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Verbest

storeteamcanadiens.com

lechikhang240

Jiustars

Vetein Venezolana tcnica de ingeniera IM FRIA

nfljersey.sale

ecgame.org

padresonlineshop.com

whitesoxfansgear.com

fkndg.top

duixianbinchen

diamondbacksedge.com

273 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#48

47 #2

Exhibit 1

47 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#39

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default,,, motion for default judgment,, #46 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/18/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MEMORANDUM by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. in support of motion for entry of default,,, motion for default judgment,, #46 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Per the status report, Status hearing is reset for 12/1/2020 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). The parties shall file a joint written status report by 11/24/2020. The court will enter a scheduling order in response to the status report. If Mailed notice (mgh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) STATUS Report by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: alljerseyshop.com, anpkickz.com, aroundu.fun, astrosapparelstore.com, astrosgoods.com, athleticsgearstoreonline.com, authentichockeystore.com, baseballjerseyline.com, bbtnew.top, bluejacketsstoreonline.com, bluejaysstoreonline.com, bluesgearstore.com, bravesedgeshop.com, bravesteamfansshop.com, brewersgearfanshop.com, bruinssportsapparel.com, bulldogsjerseycap.com, busior.com, canadienssportsstore.com, canucksnhlstore.com, cazoy.info, celticsjerseys.boston, cheapnfljerseys-wholesalechina.com, chicagocubsfansshop.com, coyotesteamfanstore.com, daezay.info, depotshared.com, devilsfanstoreonline.com, diamondbacksedge.com, dodgersonlineshop.com, ducksfanshoponline.com, ecgame.org, elitejerseysvipwholesale.com, equitylee.com, fanaticsjerseysvip.com, fashionshopping.us, fashionstyle.store, fkndg.top, flamesteamfanstore.com, flyersfansteamshop.com, footballfansjersey.com, getjerseyhub.com, gjersey.com, globalgs.xyz, greatsportsstuffs.com, highdesertstore.com, hotjersey.site, hurricanesproshop.com, inhockeyjerseys.com, jetsapparelstore.com, kcroyalsshop.com, kingsfansstoreonline.com, lightningsportingshop.com, l-sportrings.com, mageestore.com, marinersmlbstore.com, marlinsfansapparel.com, metsapparelstore.com, metsfanteamshop.com, mlbjersey.online, mlbonlinejersey.site, nakk.club, nbajerseysales.net, nbaprojersey.net, ncaabasketball.pro, nfljersey.sale, nicehaha.com, oilersapparel.com, openhousetee.com, oriolesmlbshop.com, packersjoin.com, padresonlineshop.com, panthersfansapparel.com, penguinsfansteamshop.com, philliesapparelshop.com, philliesfanstoreonline.com, piratesgearonline.com, piratesstoreonline.com, probusiness.best, raidersfanatics.online, raysstoreonline.com, redsapparelstore.com, redsoxgearshop.com, redwingsfansuniforms.com, rockiesapparelshop.com, rockiesstoreonline.com, sabressportingshop.com, saletopjerseys.com, senatorsfansgear.com, sfgiantsshoponline.com, shopdodgersonline.com, shopindiansgear.com, shopnymets.com, shoprangersapparel.com, shopteamindians.com, shopteamorioles.com, shopthemarlins.com, somylover.xyz, sportsjersey.store, sportsjerseycheap.com, sportsweardf.top, starsapparelshop.com, storediamondbacks.com, storeteamcanadiens.com, storeteamgiants.com, storetheangels.com, tbraysgear.com, teethink.com, texasrangersedge.com, thesporting.xyz, tigersbaseballshop.com, tigersbaseballstore.com, tigerssportsshop.com, triumphdepot.com, twinsmlbshop.com, twinssportinggoods.com, vanheltee.com, whitesoxedgeshop.com, whitesoxfansgear.com, wholesalenfljersey2019.com, wildsportingshop.com, yankeesofficialfanstore.com, yankeessportinggoods.com, yesjersey.cn, ymhnba.best, nbaequipshop.online, Trend Garden Store, hoodie Store, Shop5512089 Store, Angelina Sneakers Store, Shop5624071 Store, PingPeng Store, Shop5782579 Store, GG Discount Store, Shop5797589 Store, MISLIU Store, Healer Store, GoodDream Store, Joshua Ramirez, ZHANGQIANSHAOP, Skjshdbskjshdmsbdhnsndbbdbbdb, EFANBABY, Chenbing Trading Company, Verbest, 102XWH, Ealonix, dece998, Jiustars, Juluxian, dsbfnghiu.k, JaCos, Joe Studio, FantasticBall, 68627710, due895, ketu669, lizhouwei2490, zhongjiemaoyi, liningmaoyi, huyangmaoyi, xixili, Department Store -since 2016, JiangHaiSheng, koubishi, wujiaxin123, zhoucheng, standingonthtop, fortuneandgreatness, chengpan's shop, mai7, wowfshion, literaturelife, chasemoney, laurasoft, CPengshop, TwoCheng, yinghaikuang, ppopshop, HAIHE116655, kizvdw-000333, HUJklk5, makariv, gur, patacon, Elcholiris, Vetein Venezolana tcnica de ingeniera IM FRIA, zhouwenqiang, aiyalishangmo, chachashop21, Susan Green, yourfashionbuybuy, crendarron, jleticianolan, iraymonkeren, vanniaedalice, ixchellsdianara, kynleeusamora, ykhirymaximino, bjariyahmelysa, EleanorCNunnally16, bzenongilliana, yanyueshuang ghtff5, brianmoo, markblair, eddgarstev, hodgemaxt, ccitlallyephram, lechikhang240, trantuenhi28, davidcrawfor, qf0w32qh4615qw3h, PingbasongxianjXm, peterfo, willisbarr, ashleymo, georgegriff, jackjenki, kjacf nkd, davidhou, richardfo, jonesely, harlenemat, lynchabraha, priedyln, benettha, avischult, Huslsdiu, duixianbinchen, HPSXUGEHCT, Shawn Ponce, Angela Hunt, Kfgfgaren Berry, Thomas Andrews, Tracy Wilson, Sarah Olson, Gavin Williams, Becky Doyle, Patricia Flores, Gary Brewer, Dr. Cody Rodriguez, Whitney Hahn, Molly Hardy, Justin Copeland, AnGFGgela Sandoval, Mark Mccann, MiHGFHchael Stewart, PFGDGaula Cooper, Sara Romero, MRREelissa Jackson, FGBrian Clark, Sue Jenkins, JudGFy Moore, Andrew Haynes, Bggetty Wang, RRHopkins, Kelsey Armstrong, Jerry Day, Kimberly Holmes, Denisthe King, ffhfggfhf, Janice Stewart, Benjamin Combs, Amy Morris, GreHFGGgory Howard, Michael Warren, Christina Martin MD, Kathleen Trevino, Thomas Rhodes, Victoria Wright, Crystal Dunn, Bethany Tran, DGFHavid Floyd, Theresa Cuevas, Julie Arellano, Ronald Casey, LarrFGy Cruz, Smnsndbnxmsmsmhdbdndnbd, Smnsndnsmmzbdhndmzjdndnnd, Smnsndnmskskjdhrndjksndnn, zcartwrightmaira, WhbznzjzjzjJbxnzjzjxn156262, fudegardrunkendragonf, ricdo, AfraMarvins and marysherm added to case caption. (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/21/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #39 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the following documents: Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Lindsay Conn [19-20], and the TRO #32 .Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, #39 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/21/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. in support of motion for preliminary injunction, #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC. Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2020 (lma, ). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., THE UNIVERSITY ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17451916. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Collegiate Licensing Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NHL Enterprises, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant