This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2019 at 11:19:33 (UTC).

NBA Properties, Inc. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 NBA Properties, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06775

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NHL Enterprises, L.P.

NFL Properties LLC

Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges

MLB Advanced Media, L.P.

NBA Properties, Inc.

IMG College Licensing, LLC

Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

ukbaseballjerseys.com

vinabajoz.com

nbastorecamisetas.com

pileth.com

wholesalejerseysfreeshipping.us.com

tampa-bay-lightning.site

q2019shop.store

nbatrikotstore.com

nhljerseyssportsshop.com

officialjerseysonline.com

nflukstore.com

mlbonlinejersey.store

141 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

47 #1

Declaration of Jake M. Christensen

#47

#46

#45

44 #2

Exhibit 1

44 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#43

1 #8

Schedule A

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/20/2019:Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 11/20/2019. Motion for preliminary injunction #43 is granted. Status hearing set for 1/22/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IMG College Licensing, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, #43 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MEMORANDUM by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for preliminary injunction, #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/6/2019. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 11/6/2019. Plaintiffs' ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #38 is granted. Temporary restraining order is extended to 11/20/2019. Status hearing set for 11/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • BOND in the amount of $ $10,000.00, Receipt#4624232751 posted by NBA Properties, Inc. et al (yt) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (lma, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (lma, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney l. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by IMG College Licensing, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16333704. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges is a litigant

Latest cases where IMG College Licensing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NHL Enterprises, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant