This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 08:26:34 (UTC).

Nazaryk v. UMR, Inc. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Nazaryk filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UMR, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01243

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark E. Nazaryk

Defendants

UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company

United Healthcare Insurance Company

City of Arvada, Colorado

UMR, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Ty Hotchkiss

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole King Gorham

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

John C. West

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Phoenix

201 East Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2595

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#18

#16

#15

14 #1

Summons

#14

12 #2

Amended Complaint

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #1

Exhibit A

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS REQUEST as to UMR, Inc. by Plaintiff Mark E. Nazaryk. (Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER denying #16 Motion to Reset. The Court previously vacated the Scheduling Conference set for 7-6-2021, in its Order [#13]. All defendants (UMR)have not been served, therefore Plaintiff's Motion is early. Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff will refile the Motion to reset the Scheduling Conference within 3 days of all defendants being served. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6-30-2021. Text Only Entry(skclc2). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION to Reset SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Mark E. Nazaryk. (Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark E. Nazaryk. Mark E. Nazaryk served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark E. Nazaryk, filed by Mark E. Nazaryk. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. In light of its unopposed nature, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of the Amended Complaint docketed as [#12-2] within 5 days of this Order. Plaintiff shall ensure the additional defendants are served within 45 days of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 7-6-2021 is VACATED. Plaintiff is instructed to file a motion requesting the scheduling conference be reset within 3 days of the additional defendants being served. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6-23-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2). Modified on 6/25/2021 to correct docket text (jgonz, ). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify by Plaintiff Mark E. Nazaryk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Complaint)(Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company.(West, John) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company. United Healthcare Insurance Company answer due 5/19/2021. (West, John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#9) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7-6-2021 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6-29-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#6] is due 6-29-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5-11-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John C. West on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance CompanyAttorney John C. West added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft) (West, John) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Ty Hotchkiss on behalf of Mark E. NazarykAttorney Joshua Ty Hotchkiss added to party Mark E. Nazaryk(pty:pla) (Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, CCCS, and Summons upon United Healthcare Insurance Company on 04/07/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company, filed by Mark E. Nazaryk.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company from District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Case Number 2021CV031097. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7853655), filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing State Court Records)(Gorham, Nicole) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMR INC. LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Ty Hotchkiss