This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:23:57 (UTC).

NAYA v. CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 NAYA filed an Other lawsuit against CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-21255

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAUREN NAYA

Defendant

CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th St., 17Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jennifer Gomes Simil

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin P. McCoy

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jordan Burt

4221 W Boy Scout Boulevard, Suite 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

Aaron Stenzler Weiss

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

700 Nw 1St Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33136

David Robert Wright

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.

4221 W. Boy Scout Blvd., Suite 1000

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by LAUREN NAYA. Attorney Jennifer Gomes Simil added to party LAUREN NAYA(pty:pla). (Simil, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 1/3/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 12/27/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 6/15/2022. All Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 9/12/2022. Mediation Deadline 9/20/2022., Motion for Class Certification due by 7/29/2022. In Limine Motions due by 10/25/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 9/27/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/25/2022. REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/05/2022)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by LAUREN NAYA (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent Verra Mobility, Other Affiliate T2 Systems, Inc. for CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC (McCoy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT Removal by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC (McCoy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting in part #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its response to the Amended Complaint no later than May 13, 2022. The deadline contained in the Order entered on April 22, 2022 [ECF No. 4] shall not be extended. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#23

(#12) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (mdc) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 5/3/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER Requiring a Removal Status Report by 5/3/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Amended Complaint by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (McCoy, Kevin) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Docket Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated, per #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. Closing Case. (ps1) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by LAUREN NAYA. Attorney Jennifer Gomes Simil added to party LAUREN NAYA(pty:pla). (Simil, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (mdc) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 1/3/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 12/27/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 6/15/2022. All Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 9/12/2022. Mediation Deadline 9/20/2022., Motion for Class Certification due by 7/29/2022. In Limine Motions due by 10/25/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 9/27/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/25/2022. REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by LAUREN NAYA (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent Verra Mobility, Other Affiliate T2 Systems, Inc. for CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC (McCoy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT Removal by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC (McCoy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC response/answer due 5/13/2022. (ps1) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting in part #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its response to the Amended Complaint no later than May 13, 2022. The deadline contained in the Order entered on April 22, 2022 [ECF No. 4] shall not be extended. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 5/3/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Requiring a Removal Status Report by 5/3/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Amended Complaint by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2022 (McCoy, Kevin) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15581157, filed by CITATION COLLECTION SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed.(McCoy, Kevin) Modified Text on 4/22/2022 (nan). Modified text on attachment descriptions on 4/22/2022 (nan). (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Stenzler Weiss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Robert Wright

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin P. McCoy