Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 09:43:31 (UTC).

Navigators Insurance Company v. Gardner et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Navigators Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Gardner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04299

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Navigators Insurance Company

Defendants

JEAN MAHONEY GARDNER

HILL RIVKINS, LLP

SCHINDEL FARMAN LIPSIUS GARDNER & RABINOVICH, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey R Bale

Attorney at The Bale Law Firm, PLLC

1600 Highway 6 South, Suite 200

Sugar Land, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jean Mahoney Gardner served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Schindel Farman Lipsius Gardner & Rabinovich, LLP served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Docketed in Error - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/9/2021 (hlerma, 4). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Schindel Farman Lipsius Gardner & Rabinovich, LLP served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jean Mahoney Gardner served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navigators Insurance Company, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 3/5/2021 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

2 #4

Summons - Gardner Former Partner - Belmar

2 #3

Summons - Gardner Former Partner - Middletown

2 #2

Summons - Gardner Individually - Middletown

2 #1

Summons - Gardner Individually - Belmar

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Gardner Individually - Belmar, #2 Summons - Gardner Individually - Middletown, #3 Summons - Gardner Former Partner - Middletown, #4 Summons - Gardner Former Partner - Belmar)(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25690967) filed by Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jean Mahoney Gardner served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Schindel Farman Lipsius Gardner & Rabinovich, LLP served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketed in Error - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/9/2021 (hlerma, 4). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Schindel Farman Lipsius Gardner & Rabinovich, LLP served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jean Mahoney Gardner served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navigators Insurance Company, filed.(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 3/5/2021 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Gardner Individually - Belmar, #2 Summons - Gardner Individually - Middletown, #3 Summons - Gardner Former Partner - Middletown, #4 Summons - Gardner Former Partner - Belmar)(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25690967) filed by Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bale, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant