This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:06:50 (UTC).

Navigators Insurance Company et al v. Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Navigators Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colleen McMahon and Gabriel W. Gorenstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00386

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

Referral Judge

Gabriel W. Gorenstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Navigators Insurance Company

Endurance American Insurance Company

HartFord Fire Insurance Company

Endurance American Insurance Company doing business as Sompo International

Defendants

Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Maersk A/S

M/V Maersk Essen

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Paul Krauzlis

Attorney at James P. Krauzlis, Esq.

284 Baylawn Avenue

Copiague, NY 11726

Defendant Attorneys

Edward P. Flood

Attorney at Lyons & Flood, LLP

The Towers, Suite 206, 111 Great Neck Road

Great Neck, NY 11021

Jon Werner

Attorney at Lyons & Flood LLP

111 Great Neck Road, Suite 206

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Werner, Jon) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#14

(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/21/2022) (ama) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#12

(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., Maersk A/S. (vf) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#18

(#17) NOTICE of Related Cases Omitted from Consolidation Order re: (17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#7

(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Ltd., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co., S.A., and Maersk A/S, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Endurance American Insurance Company, HartFord Fire Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) Modified on 1/18/2022 (vf). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Navigators Group, Inc. for Navigators Insurance Company. Document filed by Navigators Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for HartFord Fire Insurance Company. Document filed by HartFord Fire Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney James Paul Krauzlis to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. (lb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of James P. Krauzlis re: that this action be filed as related to 21 civ 8183 ER. Document filed by Endurance American Insurance Company, HartFord Fire Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#1

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Werner, Jon) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULING ORDER re: (31 in 1:22-cv-00461-CM-GWG, 17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG, 15 in 1:21-cv-08334-CM-GWG, 10 in 1:21-cv-11176-CM-GWG, 18 in 1:22-cv-00196-CM, 18 in 1:22-cv-00370-CM, 12 in 1:22-cv-00766-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00139-CM, 10 in 1:21-cv-11171-CM-GWG, 16 in 1:22-cv-00366-CM, 16 in 1:22-cv-00386-CM-GWG, 25 in 1:22-cv-00284-CM, 22 in 1:22-cv-00148-CM-GWG, 11 in 1:22-cv-00445-CM-GWG, 32 in 1:21-cv-11213-CM, 24 in 1:22-cv-00155-CM, 10 in 1:21-cv-11173-CM-GWG, 7 in 1:22-cv-01499-CM, 17 in 1:21-cv-10857-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00265-CM, 16 in 1:22-cv-00306-CM-GWG, 18 in 1:22-cv-00194-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00374-CM, 10 in 1:22 cv-00372-CM-GWG, 6 in 1:22-cv-00460-CM, 19 in 1:22-cv-00388-CM) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that 22-cv-00439, 22-cv-00487 and 22-cv-494 be and are added to the list of consolidated cases, and that all terms of said March 2, 2022 order shall apply to said cases. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al. (kv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Related Cases Omitted from Consolidation Order re: (17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULING ORDER in case 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG; granting (29) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:21-cv-11213-CM; granting (15) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00139-CM; granting (22) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00155-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00194-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00196-CM; granting (15) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00265-CM; granting (22) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00284-CM; granting (14) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00366-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00370-CM; granting (17) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00388-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the following cases are administratively consolidated, at present for pre-trial purposes only, under the Master Case Number 21-cv-08183- which is the first filed of these cases- under the rubric "In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases:" 21 cv-08183, 21-cv-08334, 21-cv-10857, 21-cv-11171, 21-cv-11173, 21-cv-11176, 21-cv-11213, 22-cv-00139, 22-cv-00148, 22-cv-00155, 22-cv-00 194, 22 cv-00196, 22-cv-00265, 22-cv-00284, 22-cv-00306, 22-cv-00366, 22-cv-00370, 22-cv-00372, 22-cv-00374, 22-cv-00386, 22-cv-00388, 22-cv-00445, 22 cv-00460, 22-cv-00461, 22-cv-00766, 22-cv-01499. And it is further ORDERED, that the caption to be used for as long as this order is operative shall be as follows: as further set forth herein. And it is further 21 CV 08183 (CM) (GWG) ORDERED, that motions filed in connection with specific cases must be posted to ECF under both the Master Case Number and the civil action number assigned to the individual case; and it is further ORDERED, that if any party to this litigation becomes aware of a case that should be consolidated into the matter known as In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases, that party shall notify the court immediately; and it is further ORDERED, that if for any reason any subsequently-filed case cannot be consolidated into In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases, including but not limited to because of a conflict of interest on the part of the presiding District or Magistrate Judge that is both unwaivable and incurable, or if such a conflict develops in any of the cases already consolidated by virtue of this order, all reasonable efforts will be made to coordinate proceedings before any other assigned judge with proceedings in In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases; and it is further ORDERED, that the only cases to be consolidated as part of In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases are cases brought by or in right of shippers who lost cargo on this voyage, and that other types of cases that may arise out of this voyage, including specifically disputes between shippers and insurers over insurance coverage for cargo lost on this voyage, will not be deemed to be related cases and will not be handled as part of this consolidated action; and Sufficient cause appearing therefore, it is further ORDERED, that the civil case management conference currently scheduled for March 3, 2022, is adjourned, at the request of the parties (see Civ. No. 21 cv 11213, at Dkt. No. 29) to facilitate settlement discussions and the possible coordination of discovery. The case management conference will be held before Judges McMahon and Gorenstein on April 25, 2022 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 24A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. The parties are advised that the court will not further adjourn this conference.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/2/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al. (kv) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG.. (kv) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/21/2022) (ama) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., Maersk A/S. (vf) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Paul Krauzlis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Endurance American Insurance Company, Maersk A/S, M/V Maersk Essen, SC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney James Paul Krauzlis to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. (lb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Ltd., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co., S.A., and Maersk A/S, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Endurance American Insurance Company, HartFord Fire Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) Modified on 1/18/2022 (vf). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Navigators Group, Inc. for Navigators Insurance Company. Document filed by Navigators Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for HartFord Fire Insurance Company. Document filed by HartFord Fire Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endurance Assurance Corporation for Endurance American Insurance Company. Document filed by Endurance American Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) Modified on 1/18/2022 (lb). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of James P. Krauzlis re: that this action be filed as related to 21 civ 8183 ER. Document filed by Endurance American Insurance Company, HartFord Fire Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jiamao International Ship Lease Company Limited, M/V Maersk Essen, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., Maersk A/S. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25591631)Document filed by Navigators Insurance Company, HartFord Fire Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company..(Krauzlis, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jiamoa International Ship Lease Company Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endurance American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant