This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2020 at 13:00:20 (UTC).

Naveja v. Primerica, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Naveja filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Primerica, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01298

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Naveja

Defendants

Primerica Financial Services, LLC

Primerica Client Services, Inc.

Primerica Life Insurance Company

Primerica, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sang D. Song

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Ave., Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Ave., Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Douglas Han

Attorney at Justice Law Corporation

751 N. Fair Oaks Ave., Suite 101

Pasadena, CA 91103

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Michael Lutz

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Cary G. Palmer

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

Nathan Wade Austin

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

Stephen Christopher Whittaker

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive, 12Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY by Maria Naveja re #9 Opposition to Motion. (Song, Sang) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#9

(#9) OPPOSITION by Primerica Client Services, Inc., Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Primerica Life Insurance Company, Primerica, Inc. to #7 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert H. Peterman Jr.)(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

5 #3

Proposed Order

5 #2

Declaration of Stephen C. Whittaker

5 #1

Declaration of Mark Beauchamp

#5

(#5) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and MOTION to DISMISS or STAY by Primerica Client Services, Inc. et al. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Beauchamp, #2 Declaration of Stephen C. Whittaker, #3 Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian) Modified on 7/21/2020 (Coll, A). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION EXTENDING deadline to respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Primerica Client Services, Inc., Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Primerica Life Insurance Company, Primerica, Inc. (Lutz, Brian) Modified on 7/8/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Primerica Client Services, Inc., Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Primerica Life Insurance Company, Primerica, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Austin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8967385) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Austin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY by Maria Naveja re #9 Opposition to Motion. (Song, Sang) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPPOSITION by Primerica Client Services, Inc., Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Primerica Life Insurance Company, Primerica, Inc. to #7 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert H. Peterman Jr.)(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 9/3/2020 hearing on the Motion to Remand #7 is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to REMAND by Maria Naveja. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Song, Sang) Modified on 7/29/2020 (Reader, L). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 9/17/2020 hearing on the Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss or Stay #5 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and MOTION to DISMISS or STAY by Primerica Client Services, Inc. et al. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Beauchamp, #2 Declaration of Stephen C. Whittaker, #3 Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian) Modified on 7/21/2020 (Coll, A). (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION EXTENDING deadline to respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Primerica Client Services, Inc., Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Primerica Life Insurance Company, Primerica, Inc. (Lutz, Brian) Modified on 7/8/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Primerica Client Services, Inc., Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Primerica Life Insurance Company, Primerica, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Austin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8967385) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Austin, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Primerica, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Primerica Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sang D Song,