This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2020 at 09:25:32 (UTC).

Nava v. American Express Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Nava filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against American Express Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00619

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberto Nava

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

American Express Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Forrest Raburn

Attorney at McCarty & Raburn, A Consumer Law Firm PLLC - Rockwall

2931 Ridge Rd, Suite 101 #504

Rockwall, TX 75032

Dennis Dean McCarty

Attorney at McCarty & Raburn, A Consumer Law Firm PLLC - Rockwall

2931 Ridge Rd, Suite 101 #504

Rockwall, TX 75032

Defendant Attorneys

Jarmonique Smith

Attorney at Jones Day - Houston

717 Texas, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Ryan W. Wham

Attorney at Jones Day - Houston

717 Texas, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Brittany Nicole Vanek

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP - Houston

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jarmonique Smith on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8045341. (Smith, Jarmonique) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER - GRANTING #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan W. Wham terminated. Jarmonique C. Smith substituted as attorney of record Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/5/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Express Company.( Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Nava. American Express Company served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Raburn, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Experian Information Solutions, Inc..( Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Nava. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Raburn, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to American Express Company. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Experian Report

1 #1

Exhibit Experian Report

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7941331.), filed by Roberto Nava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Experian Report, #2 Exhibit Experian Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raburn, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jarmonique Smith on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8045341. (Smith, Jarmonique) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotified Attorney for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Jarmonique C. Smith, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY*** (baf, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - GRANTING #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan W. Wham terminated. Jarmonique C. Smith substituted as attorney of record Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/5/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Express Company to 10/30/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Express Company.( Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Nava. American Express Company served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Raburn, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to 10/19/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Experian Information Solutions, Inc..( Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Nava. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Raburn, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to American Express Company. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7941331.), filed by Roberto Nava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Experian Report, #2 Exhibit Experian Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raburn, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan W. Wham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Nicole Vanek