This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 09:51:07 (UTC).

Nature's Sunshine Products v. Kumets et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Nature's Sunshine Products filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kumets. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Romero and Tena Campbell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00658

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Cecilia M. Romero

Tena Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nature's Sunshine Products

Defendants

Simon Kumets

Charles Kumets

Pavel Kumets

Brilliant Solutions

Alla Kumets

Strul Kumets

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Kent A. Britt

Attorney at VORYS SATER SEYMOUR & PEASE LLP

301 E Fourth St, Great American Tower Ste 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorney

R. Jeremy Adamson

Attorney at KUNZLER BEAN & ADAMSON

50 W Broadway Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#22

#21

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order Setting Deadline for Responding to Complaint

#20

#19

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit A - Application

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Nature's Sunshine Products. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER: Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint properly alleging the citizenship of Brilliant Solutions so this court can determine whether it can exercise diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/10/20 (alt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#25) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#24) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Nature's Sunshine Products. (alf) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#23) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Brilliant Solutions, Alla Kumets, Charles Kumets, Pavel Kumets, Simon Kumets, Strul Kumets. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to 11/17/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/27/20. (alf) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Brilliant Solutions, Alla Kumets, Charles Kumets, Pavel Kumets, Simon Kumets, Strul Kumets, Plaintiff Nature's Sunshine Products. Form due by 11/12/2020. (alf) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, (Joint) filed by Defendants Brilliant Solutions, Alla Kumets, Charles Kumets, Pavel Kumets, Simon Kumets, Strul Kumets. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Setting Deadline for Responding to Complaint) Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Brilliant Solutions(pty:dft), Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Alla Kumets(pty:dft), Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Charles Kumets(pty:dft), Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Pavel Kumets(pty:dft), Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Simon Kumets(pty:dft), Attorney R. Jeremy Adamson added to party Strul Kumets(pty:dft)(Adamson, R.) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nature's Sunshine Products as to Brilliant Solutions served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nature's Sunshine Products as to Strul Kumets served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alla Kumets. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pavel Kumets. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Strul Kumets. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brilliant Solutions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent A. Britt for Nature's Sunshine Products.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/20/20. (alf) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kent A. Britt , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3739920,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Nature's Sunshine Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Call, Monica) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Kent A. Britt, for Plaintiff Nature's Sunshine Products (jl) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/21/20. (alf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3724741) filed by Nature's Sunshine Products. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Call, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Nature's Sunshine Products is directed to E-File the complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nature's Sunshine Products is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica S. Call

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent Allen Britt