This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 08:20:44 (UTC).

Natividad et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Case Summary

On February 23, 2021, Abel Natvidad, Anthony Paul Irvin, Antonio D. Logan, Barbara Lynn Birks, Daniel Zachary Tennant and others (“Plaintiffs”) filed a personal injury lawsuit against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (“Gilead” or “Defendant”) seeking damages, restitution and disgorgement for allegedly causing injuries to Plaintiffs sustained as a result of ingesting one or more of the prescription drugs Viread, Truvada, Atripla, Complera, and Stribild, which are manufactured and marketed by Gilead for the treatment of Human Immunodeficiency Virus-1 (“HIV”) infection. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Jon S. Tigar and Judge Joseph C. Spero presiding.

 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that “Gilead designed each of the drugs to contain a form of the compound tenofovir that Gilead knew was toxic to patients’ kidneys and bones” and that Because an intravenous tenofovir formulation had little sales potential, Gilead developed a form of tenofovir, tenofovir disoproxil, which can be taken orally. The fumaric acid salt of tenofovir disoproxil is tenofovir disoproxil fumarate (“TDF”). When a patient takes a pill containing TDF, the patient’s body converts TDF into tenofovir. Although TDF can be taken by mouth, a high dose of 300 mg is typically required to achieve the desired therapeutic effect.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that “Gilead also made Stribild even more dangerous to Plaintiffs when it designed the drug to include cobicistat in combination with 300 mg TDF. Cobicistat is a pharmacoenhancer or “booster” that inhibits the breakdown of elvitegravir, another active ingredient in Stribild. Cobicistat allows elvitegravir to persist in the patient’s system long enough to permit once-daily dosing” and that “in addition to withholding safer designs, Gilead failed to adequately warn physicians and patients about the risks and safe use of TDF. Gilead provided only the weakest, inadequate warnings to doctors and patients about the need for frequent monitoring of all patients for TDF-associated kidney and bone damage—preventing doctors from detecting early signs of TDF toxicity.”

 

The Plaintiffs therefore alleged that “Gilead intentionally withheld a safer alternative design of TDF Drugs it knew to be dangerously toxic to patients’ kidneys and bones, while failing to adequately warn about the risks and safer use of the defective drugs, solely to make more money.”

 

There are nine claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. In the first and second counts the Plaintiffs have claimed that the Defendant is liable for strict product liability and failure to warn with reference to design defects under the laws of states of Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Illinois, Nevada, Tennessee and/or Texas. The third, fourth and fifth counts have been laid down by Plaintiffs under  Louisiana Products Liability Act, LA. R.S. §§ 9:2800.51, et. seq., New Jersey Products Liability Act N.J. STAT. §§ 2A:58C-1 et. seq. And Ohio Products Liability Act OHIO REV. CODE ANN. §§ 2307.71 et. seq. The sixth count is for negligence and gross negligence under the laws of Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Illinois, Nevada, Ohio, Pennsylvania, Tennessee and Texas. The Seventh count is for fraud by omission under laws of Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Illinois, Nevada, Ohio, Tennessee and Texas. The eighth count is for breach of implied warranty of merchantability and the ninth count relates to violation of state consumer protection laws.

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the court to pass an order to declare that the conduct of Gilead is unlawful/unfair and to award actual, compensatory, statutory, punitive and exemplary damages in addition to an order for restitution and restitutionary disgorgement and costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01282

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lori K. Thomas

Sabrina M. Cooper

Kawanah Gilmore

Minnet E. Sparks

Tony B. Saffo

Emily Nichols

Josephine Cole Dennis

Daniel Zachary Tennant

Lola D. Long

Anthony Paul Irvin

Denise Henderson

Antonio D. Logan

Keith A. Gaudet, Sr.

Lisa M. Roberts

John Y. Polanco

Barbara Lynn Birks

Estella Ross

Mattie L. Gadson

Abel Natividad

Defendant

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Anne Fornecker Johnson

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Benjamin Ryan O'Connor

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP

444 West Lake Street Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60606

R. Allan Pixton

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP

719 S Shoreline

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Katrina R. Ashley

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzalez LLP

719 South Shoreline Boulevard

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Robert Carl Hilliard

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales L.L.P.

719 S. Shoreline Boulevard

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorney

Joshua Eugene Anderson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 W 5Th St

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#8

#7

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Exhibit A (Notice Letter)

#1

14 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Ryan O'Connor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Allan Pixton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina R. Ashley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The Certificate of Good Standing has expired. Please re-file in its entirety with an updated certi ficate. Re: #16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734718.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Lola D. Long, Larry Blackmon, Jr., Hugh B. Callaway, Darryll Keith Davis, Anthony Paul Irvin, Marron L. Pickett, Denise Henderson, Tommy L. Lagory, Nina S. Gray, Gregory K. Collier, Marvell Moore, Emily Nichols, Lori K. Thomas, Minnet E. Sparks, John Y. Polanco, Gregory W. Upshaw, Michael A. Holland, Daniel Zachary Tennant, Lisa M. Roberts, Sabrina M. Cooper, Mattie L. Gadson, Estella Ross, Barbara Lynn Birks, Tony B. Saffo, Jr., Antonio D. Logan, Melissa Ann Shields, Kawanah Gilmore, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr., Lorena Jean Leamon, Abel Natividad, Josephine Cole Dennis (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (614) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (18) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01282-JST; granting (18) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01499-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Abel Natividad. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734972.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Barbara Lynn Birks, Larry Blackmon, Jr, Hugh B. Callaway, Gregory K. Collier, Sabrina M. Cooper, Darryll Keith Davis, Josephine Cole Dennis, Mattie L. Gadson, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr, Kawanah Gilmore, Nina S. Gray, Denise Henderson, Michael A. Holland, Anthony Paul Irvin, Tommy L. Lagory, Lorena Jean Leamon, Antonio D. Logan, Lola D. Long, Marvell Moore, Abel Natividad, Emily Nichols, Marron L. Pickett, John Y. Polanco, Lisa M. Roberts, Estella Ross, Tony B. Saffo, Jr, Melissa Ann Shields, Minnet E. Sparks, Daniel Zachary Tennant, Lori K. Thomas, Gregory W. Upshaw. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734718.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Barbara Lynn Birks, Larry Blackmon, Jr, Hugh B. Callaway, Gregory K. Collier, Sabrina M. Cooper, Darryll Keith Davis, Josephine Cole Dennis, Mattie L. Gadson, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr, Kawanah Gilmore, Nina S. Gray, Denise Henderson, Michael A. Holland, Anthony Paul Irvin, Tommy L. Lagory, Lorena Jean Leamon, Antonio D. Logan, Lola D. Long, Marvell Moore, Abel Natividad, Emily Nichols, Marron L. Pickett, John Y. Polanco, Lisa M. Roberts, Estella Ross, Tony B. Saffo, Jr, Melissa Ann Shields, Minnet E. Sparks, Daniel Zachary Tennant, Lori K. Thomas, Gregory W. Upshaw. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734849.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Barbara Lynn Birks, Larry Blackmon, Jr, Hugh B. Callaway, Gregory K. Collier, Sabrina M. Cooper, Darryll Keith Davis, Josephine Cole Dennis, Mattie L. Gadson, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr, Kawanah Gilmore, Nina S. Gray, Denise Henderson, Michael A. Holland, Anthony Paul Irvin, Tommy L. Lagory, Lorena Jean Leamon, Antonio D. Logan, Lola D. Long, Marvell Moore, Abel Natividad, Emily Nichols, Marron L. Pickett, John Y. Polanco, Lisa M. Roberts, Estella Ross, Tony B. Saffo, Jr, Melissa Ann Shields, Minnet E. Sparks, Daniel Zachary Tennant, Lori K. Thomas, Gregory W. Upshaw. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735074.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Barbara Lynn Birks, Larry Blackmon, Jr, Hugh B. Callaway, Gregory K. Collier, Sabrina M. Cooper, Darryll Keith Davis, Josephine Cole Dennis, Mattie L. Gadson, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr, Kawanah Gilmore, Nina S. Gray, Denise Henderson, Michael A. Holland, Anthony Paul Irvin, Tommy L. Lagory, Lorena Jean Leamon, Antonio D. Logan, Lola D. Long, Marvell Moore, Abel Natividad, Emily Nichols, Marron L. Pickett, John Y. Polanco, Lisa M. Roberts, Estella Ross, Tony B. Saffo, Jr, Melissa Ann Shields, Minnet E. Sparks, Daniel Zachary Tennant, Lori K. Thomas, Gregory W. Upshaw. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734718.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lori K. Thomas, Denise Henderson, Michael A. Holland, Anthony Paul Irvin, Larry Blackmon, Jr, Abel Natividad, Lisa M. Roberts, Tommy L. Lagory, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr, Minnet E. Sparks, Melissa Ann Shields, Nina S. Gray, Josephine Cole Dennis, Lorena Jean Leamon, Mattie L. Gadson, Gregory K. Collier, Tony B. Saffo, Jr, Gregory W. Upshaw, Marron L. Pickett, Marvell Moore, John Y. Polanco, Sabrina M. Cooper, Darryll Keith Davis, Antonio D. Logan, Estella Ross, Hugh B. Callaway, Kawanah Gilmore, Emily Nichols, Barbara Lynn Birks, Lola D. Long, Daniel Zachary Tennant. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FORPRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (610) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (7) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01282-JST; granting (7) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01499-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RELATING CASES to 18-cv-06972-JST. Motions terminated: (608 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 17, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/30/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15608455). Filed by Lori K. Thomas, Denise Henderson, Michael A. Holland, Anthony Paul Irvin, Larry Blackmon, Jr, Abel Natividad, Lisa M. Roberts, Tommy L. Lagory, Keith A. Gaudet, Sr, Minnet E. Sparks, Melissa Ann Shields, Nina S. Gray, Josephine Cole Dennis, Lorena Jean Leamon, Mattie L. Gadson, Gregory K. Collier, Tony B. Saffo, Jr., Gregory W. Upshaw, Marron L. Pickett, Marvell Moore, John Y. Polanco, Sabrina M. Cooper, Darryll Keith Davis, Antonio D. Logan, Estella Ross, Hugh B. Callaway, Kawanah Gilmore, Emily Nichols, Barbara Lynn Birks, Lola D. Long, Daniel Zachary Tennant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice Letter), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/23/2021) Modified on 2/24/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Eugene Anderson