This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:22:19 (UTC).

Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Nationwide Property Casualty Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven J. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00433

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven J. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Jakel Motors Incorporated

Jakel Incorporated

Broan-NuTone, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P. Sherman

Attorney at Sherman Law PLLC

111 Bow St, Unit #2

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Defendant Attorney

Andrew D. Black

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Rd

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Broan-Nutone LLC

1 #3

Summons Jakel Motors Incorporated

#2

2 #1

Notice ECF

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketTRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 6/18/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 7/2/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 7/20/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER approving #10 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5-6 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 7/20/2021. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/15/2020. Discovery deadline 2/12/2021. Joint Statement re: Mediation Follow Up on 2/28/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/15/2021.(lw) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed as to Jakel Motors Incorporated by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 4/13/2020. Answer Follow Up on 5/4/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed as to Broan-NuTone, LLC by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 4/13/2020. Answer Follow Up on 5/4/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/21/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement by Jakel Motors Incorporated disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated.(Black, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement by Broan-NuTone, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC.(Black, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sherman, John) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE re #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by April 15, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 4/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses issued electronically as to Broan-NuTone, LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-433-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1961194 filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Broan-Nutone LLC, #3 Summons Jakel Motors Incorporated)(Sherman, John) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jakel Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED is a litigant