This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 09:29:21 (UTC).

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Western World Insurance Group

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Western World Insurance Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant

Western World Insurance Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric David Miller

Attorney at Miller Bonham LLP

115 Perimeter Center Place, South Terraces, Suite 430

Atlanta, GA 30346

Joseph Charles Proulx

Attorney at Golden Scaz Gagain

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Dixon

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

M. Angela Cooper

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 (for Def Western World's Resp to Plf discovery) by Western World Insurance Group.(Cooper, M.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit Attachment E - Western World Company policies Bates No's. WWIC 0000

#9

(#9) Initial Disclosures by Western World Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment E - Western World Company policies Bates No's. WWIC 000006 - WWIC 000352)(Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: for #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties request for An 8-month discovery track is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 04/28/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Western World Insurance Group. (Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Joseph Charles Proulx added as attorney. (Proulx, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - Jury Demand by Defendant

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Answer of Defendant

#5

(#5) NOTICE Of Filing Western World Insurance Group's Supplement to Court Record and Notice of Removal by Western World Insurance Group re #1 Notice of Removal, and Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer of Defendant, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jury Demand by Defendant)(Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#4

(#4) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-10875471. (Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#3

(#3) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021.(jkb) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Western World Insurance Group. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-10875732) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet F)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/06/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 (for Def Western World's Resp to Plf discovery) by Western World Insurance Group.(Cooper, M.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Disclosures by Western World Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment E - Western World Company policies Bates No's. WWIC 000006 - WWIC 000352)(Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: for #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties request for An 8-month discovery track is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 04/28/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Western World Insurance Group. (Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketRefund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 4/21/2021 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Joseph Charles Proulx added as attorney. (Proulx, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Approval re #4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Of Filing Western World Insurance Group's Supplement to Court Record and Notice of Removal by Western World Insurance Group re #1 Notice of Removal, and Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer of Defendant, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jury Demand by Defendant)(Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-10875471. (Cooper, M.) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021.(jkb) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Western World Insurance Group. Discovery ends on 8/30/2021.(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Western World Insurance Group. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-10875732) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet F)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Angela Cooper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Dixon