This case was last updated from PACER on 09/03/2019 at 07:26:07 (UTC).

Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Wells et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wells. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Ronald Wells

Sherry Bateman

Linda Wells

George Wells

Defendants, Counter Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Linda Wells

Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Steven C. Cookston

Attorney at UPSHAW, WILLIAMS, BIGGERS & BECKHAM, LLP - Greenwood

P.O. Drawer 8230, 309 Fulton Street (38930)

Greenwood, MS 38935-8230

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

William H. Jones

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM HAROLD JONES

P. O. Box 282

Petal, MS 39465-0282

Mark A. Nelson

Attorney at NELSON TOUCHSTONE, PLLC

18 Bellegrass Boulevard

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Ned Andrew Nelson

Attorney at NELSON TOUCHSTONE, PLLC

18 Bellegrass Boulevard

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Defendant, Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Ned Andrew Nelson

Attorney at NELSON TOUCHSTONE, PLLC

18 Bellegrass Boulevard

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Steven C. Cookston

Attorney at UPSHAW, WILLIAMS, BIGGERS & BECKHAM, LLP - Greenwood

P.O. Drawer 8230, 309 Fulton Street (38930)

Greenwood, MS 38935-8230

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

William H. Jones

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM HAROLD JONES

P. O. Box 282

Petal, MS 39465-0282

 

Court Documents

#1

(#16) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B-Last Will and Testament of Jerry T. Wells

1 #2

Exhibit A-Policy Declarations Pages and Sample Policy

1 #4

Exhibit C-May 2, 2019 and May 31, 2019 Correspondence

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ned Andrew Nelson on behalf of Linda Wells (Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#3

(#14) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Cookston, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Nelson on behalf of Linda Wells (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued re cross-claim as to Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells. (LDR) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#19

(#19) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/27/19.(KPM) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#18

(#18) Cross COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Wells, filed by George Wells, Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#17

(#17) Defendants ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim and Defenses of Linda Wells by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#16

(#16) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. Sherry Bateman served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Cookston, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Jones on behalf of Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman, George Wells. (Jones, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (LDR). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#12

(#12) Summons Reissued re Cross-Claim in a Lawsuit as to Sherry Bateman. (LDR) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 10/1/2019 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/27/19. (KPM) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2019 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 9/27/19.(KPM) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Cross COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Wells, filed by George Wells, Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Defendants ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim and Defenses of Linda Wells by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment by Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells.(Jones, William) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. Sherry Bateman served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Cookston, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #13 : This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (LDR) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Jones on behalf of Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman, George Wells. (Jones, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (LDR). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Reissued re Cross-Claim in a Lawsuit as to Sherry Bateman. (LDR) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. Ronald Wells served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wells. George Wells served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Reissued as to Sherry Bateman. (LDR) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Upshaw Williams requesting re-issuance of Summons for defendant Sherry Bateman (LDR) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells. (LDR) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued re cross-claim as to Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Ronald Wells. (LDR) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Nelson on behalf of Linda Wells (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against George Wells, Ronald Wells, Sherry Bateman, COUNTERCLAIM against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company by Linda Wells.(Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ned Andrew Nelson on behalf of Linda Wells (Nelson, Ned) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Judgment against Sherry Bateman, George Wells, Linda Wells, Ronald Wells (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643006314), filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Policy Declarations Pages and Sample Policy, #3 Exhibit B-Last Will and Testament of Jerry T. Wells, #4 Exhibit C-May 2, 2019 and May 31, 2019 Correspondence) (CS) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.