This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 07:47:15 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Davidson Fink, LLP

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Davidson Fink, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03378

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

Defendant

Davidson Fink, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan Michael Smith

Attorney at Akerman LLP

520 Madison Avenue, Ste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

Defendant Attorney

Joseph L Francoeur

Attorney at Wilson Elser

150 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Letter in response to pre-motion letter setting out bases for opposition to proposed motion by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Smith, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) First MOTION for pre motion conference for Davidson Fink in accordance with Judge's Rule 4(a)(2) by Davidson Fink, LLP. (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davidson Fink, LLP (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint [Docket No. 1] by Davidson Fink, LLP. (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Francoeur on behalf of Davidson Fink, LLP (aty to be noticed) (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Davidson Fink, LLP. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #3

Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Davidson Fink, LLP filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13124502 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Smith, Jordan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter in response to pre-motion letter setting out bases for opposition to proposed motion by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Smith, Jordan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #9 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Defendant's Application for a Pre-Motion Conference is GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and email the court's Deputy at Joseph_Reccoppa@nyed.uscourts.gov to schedule the conference. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/17/2020. (Freund, Zachary) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for pre motion conference for Davidson Fink in accordance with Judge's Rule 4(a)(2) by Davidson Fink, LLP. (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davidson Fink, LLP (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The Motion for extension of time to answer #7 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/18/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/30/2020. (Altreuter, Sylvia) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint [Docket No. 1] by Davidson Fink, LLP. (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Francoeur on behalf of Davidson Fink, LLP (aty to be noticed) (Francoeur, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Davidson Fink, LLP. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Davidson Fink, LLP filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13124502 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Smith, Jordan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less