This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 08:44:39 (UTC).

NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE et al v. TRUMP et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TRUMP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03121

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE

NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE

Defendants

EUGENE SCALIA

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

DONALD J. TRUMP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ajmel A. Quereshi

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC

700 14Th Street Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Samuel Spital

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.

40 Rector Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Jin Hee Lee

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.

40 Rector Street, Ste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Amber Micole Koonce

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.

40 Rector Street, Ste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Monique Lin-Luse

Attorney at NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.

40 Rector Street, Ste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Text of Proposed Order

15 #1

Declaration of Janai Nelson

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit - Confirmation Showing Date of Service

#12

#11

#10

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

1 #6

Summons - United States Attorney's Office

1 #5

Summons - Attorney General of the United States

1 #4

Summons - U.S. Department of Labor

1 #3

Summons - Eugene Scalia

1 #2

Summons - Donald J. Trump

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Janai Nelson is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/25/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Janai Nelson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7880864. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janai Nelson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Micole Koonce on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koonce, Amber) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jin Hee Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lee, Jin Hee) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 11/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Confirmation Showing Date of Service)(Quereshi, Ajmel) Modified serve date on 11/19/2020 (eg). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Monique Lin-Luse on behalf of NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE (Lin-Luse, Monique) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/29/2020. (Quereshi, Ajmel) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/05/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Confirmation Showing Date of Service)(Quereshi, Ajmel) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EUGENE SCALIA served on 11/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Confirmation Showing Date of Service)(Quereshi, Ajmel) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 11/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Confirmation Showing Date of Service)(Quereshi, Ajmel) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amber Koonce is hereby admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/4/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jin Hee Lee is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/4/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amber Koonce, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7780127. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber Koonce, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jin Hee Lee, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7780092. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jin Hee Lee, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Monique N. Lin-Luse is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/4/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Monique N. Lin-Luse, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7779333. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monique N. Lin-Luse, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ajmel A. Quereshi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Quereshi, Ajmel) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to EUGENE SCALIA, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7773598) filed by NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE, NATIONAL FAIR HOUSING ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Donald J. Trump, #3 Summons - Eugene Scalia, #4 Summons - U.S. Department of Labor, #5 Summons - Attorney General of the United States, #6 Summons - United States Attorney's Office)(Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Urban League is a litigant

Latest cases where National Fair Housing Alliance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jin Hee Lee