This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2021 at 03:14:31 (UTC).

National Urban League et al v. Ross et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 National Urban League filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Ross. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucy H. Koh and Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05799

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Los Angeles, California

League of Women Voters

Adrian Garcia

King County, Washington

National Urban League

Harris County, Texas

City of San Jose, California

Black Alliance For Just Immigration

City of Salinas, California

Rodney Ellis

Navajo Nation

County of Los Angeles, California

Defendants

U.S. Census Bureau

U.S. Department of Commerce

Amicus Curiae

Lush Cosmetics LLC

Zendesk Inc.

State of New York

New York, NY 10005

Postmates Inc.

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Luce Goldstein

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 North Spring Street, 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Anne Wylde Robinson

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Melissa Arbus Sherry

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh St. Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Steven Mark Bauer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sadik Harry Huseny

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Wendy R Weiser

Attorney at Brennan Center for Justice

120 Broadway

New York City, NY 10271

Richard P. Bress

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Thomas Patrick Wolf

Attorney at Brennan Center for Justice

120 Broadway, Suite 1750

New York, NY 10271

Gemma Donofrio

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Tyce Randall Walters

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Kelly Marita Percival

Attorney at The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law

120 Broadway, Suite 1750

New York, NY 10271

Genevieve P. Hoffman

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Shannon Danielle Lankenau

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Christopher Alan Callihan

Attorney at City Attorney

200 Lincoln Ave

Salinas, CA 93901

Michael David Mutalipassi

Attorney at City of Salinas

200 Lincoln Avenue

Salinas, CA 93901

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel D. Mauler

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Ave, Nw, Room 6141

Washington, DC 20530

Jeffrey Bossert Clark

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Andrew Zee

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

450 Golden Gate Avenue, Room 7-5395

San Francisco, CA 94102

Other Attorneys

Stephen Michael Duvernay

Attorney at Benbrook Law Group

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530

Sacramento, CA 95814

Mark Flessner

Attorney at CORPORATION COUNSEL FOR THE

121 N. Lasalle Street, Room 600

Chicago, IL 60602

56 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#490

#489

#488

#487

#486

#484

#483

#482

#210

#6

5 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service certificate of good standing

#5

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#4

2 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

867 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#490) ORDER of USCA as to #210 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham. Appellants unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All pending motions are denied as moot. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#489) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #488 Stipulation of Dismissal.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#488) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Order Regarding Dismissal) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#487) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#486) NOTICE of Change of Address by Lily E. Hough (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#485) Per #484 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from April 16, 2021 to April 23, 2021 at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconferen ce are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#484) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part #483 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings and Continue Case Management Conference. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#483) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#482) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Los Angeles, California, City of Salinas, California, City of San Jose, California, County of Los Angeles, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, Navajo Nation, The National Association for the Advancement of Colored People. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#481) Per #480 Order, the Further Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from April 2, 2021 to April 16, 2021 at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconferen ce are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
469 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard P. Bress ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14832247.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Plaintiffs National Urban League; League of Women Voters; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Harris County, Texas; King County, Washington; City of San Jose, California; Rodney Ellis and Adrian Garcia (Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-05799 NC with 5:20-cv-05167 LHK and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/18/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Wendy Weiser ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14830320.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service certificate of good standing)(Weiser, Wendy) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14830168.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Percival, Kelly) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14829876.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Harris County, Texas, King County, Washington, League of Women Voters, National Urban League. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wolf, Thomas) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-14828740) against Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Filed byCity of Los Angeles, California, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Salinas, California, Rodney Ellis, League of Women Voters, City of San Jose, California, Harris County, Texas, National Urban League, Adrian Garcia, King County, Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Black Alliance for Just Immigration is a litigant

Latest cases where Lush Cosmetics LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zendesk Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Urban League is a litigant