This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:51:58 (UTC).

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Terra Logistics Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Terra Logistics Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Defendant

Terra Worldwide Logistics, LLC doing business as American Global Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donavan Eason

Blair Joseph Cash

Defendant Attorney

T. Brandon Welch

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Terra Logistics Company. (pdt) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG) for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/25/2023. (dob) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Terra Logistics Company served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Petition for Leave of Absence

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Terra Logistics Company. Discovery ends on 7/10/2023.(Welch, T.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terra Logistics Company. (Welch, T.) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#10

(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed by the Parties, (JPRDP, Doc. #10 ), the Court ORDERS that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, and filing motions are as stated in JPRDP. The parties' request for an eight-month discovery period is GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to file the joint motion to substitute party name, as discussed in the JPRDP. (Id. at 5-6.) The parties indicate in the JPRDP that such a motion has been filed; however, the docket reflects no such filing. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/6/2023. (tmf) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Substituting Party

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Party. Terra Worldwide Logistics, LLC d/b/a American Global Logistics is hereby substituted in place of Defendant Terra Logistics Company d/b/a American Global Logistics, LLC. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/6/23. (hfm) (hfm). (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Terra Logistics Company d/b/ American Global Logistics, LLCby National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Substituting Party)(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed by the Parties, (JPRDP, Doc. #10 ), the Court ORDERS that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, and filing motions are as stated in JPRDP. The parties' request for an eight-month discovery period is GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to file the joint motion to substitute party name, as discussed in the JPRDP. (Id. at 5-6.) The parties indicate in the JPRDP that such a motion has been filed; however, the docket reflects no such filing. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/6/2023. (tmf) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terra Logistics Company. (Welch, T.) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Terra Logistics Company. Discovery ends on 7/10/2023.(Welch, T.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/21/23-2/23/23, 3/20/23, 4/3/23-4/7/23, 6/19/23-6/22/23, 6/26/23-7/7/23, 7/17/23-7/24/23, 9/18/23-9/22/23, 10/10/23-10/13/23, 12/20/23-1/3/24, by Blair Joseph Cash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Petition for Leave of Absence)(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Terra Logistics Company served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/25/2023. (dob) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG) for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Terra Logistics Company. (pdt) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12313845) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less