This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 09:25:42 (UTC).

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa v. New Dominion LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against New Dominion LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Defendants

Anthony Kralik

William Gardner

Roland Lozier

Greg Depew

Gagelene Tyree

Jordan Hernandez

Larry Harlow

Michael Preston

Shirley Weiss

Marilyn Duesterhaus

David Ball

Ellen Maxwell

John Schwall

Robert Talbot

William Wood

Sherry Howard

Earl White

388 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David A Poarch, Jr

Attorney at Law Offices of Bailey & Poarch

301 E Eufaula

Norman, OK 73069

Other Attorneys

Ellen Mary Van Meir

Attorney at Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sulli

2501 North Harwood Street, Suite 1210

Dallas, TX 75201

Steven E Holden

Attorney at Holden & Carr-TULSA

15 E Fifth St, Suite 3900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Orion A Strand

Attorney at Holden Litigation

114 East Sheridan, Suite 101

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Andrew C Jayne

Attorney at Baum Glass Jayne & Carwile PLLC

401 S Boston Ave, Suite 2300

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jason A McVicker

Attorney at Baum Glass Jayne & Carwile PLLC

401 S Boston Ave, Suite 2300

Tulsa, OK 74103

Edward L White

Attorney at Edward L White PC

829 E 33Rd St

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) AMENDED ANSWER to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's First #6 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa by New Dominion LLC. (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#43

(#43) ORDER granting #38 Motion for Order of Admission of Scott Poynter Under Local Rule 83.2. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/26/2022. (mb) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#42

(#42) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 9/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 9/15/2022; Pla witness list due 9/15/2022; Pla exhibit list due 9/15/2022; Motions in limine due 12/2/2022; Jury instructions due 12/2/2022; Voir dire requests due 12/2/2022; Discovery due by 11/3/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 10/3/2022. Pretrial Report due by 12/2/2022.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/25/2022. (mb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#41

(#41) ORDER granting #39 Motion to Amend Its Answer to Assert Counterclaims Against National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/21/2022. (kmt) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#40

(#40) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Strand, Orion) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

39 #1

Exhibit 1-Proposed Amendment

39 #39

Main Document

#38

(#38) MOTION for Order for Admission of Scott Poynter to Bar of this Court by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Poarch, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

37 #2

Exhibit

6 #10

Exhibit 10

6 #9

Exhibit 9

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

#4

#3

#2

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) AMENDED ANSWER to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's First #6 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa by New Dominion LLC. (Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting #38 Motion for Order of Admission of Scott Poynter Under Local Rule 83.2. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/26/2022. (mb) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 9/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 9/15/2022; Pla witness list due 9/15/2022; Pla exhibit list due 9/15/2022; Motions in limine due 12/2/2022; Jury instructions due 12/2/2022; Voir dire requests due 12/2/2022; Discovery due by 11/3/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 10/3/2022. Pretrial Report due by 12/2/2022.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/25/2022. (mb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #39 Motion to Amend Its Answer to Assert Counterclaims Against National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/21/2022. (kmt) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Strand, Orion) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION to Amend/Correct its Answer to Assert Counterclaims Against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA by New Dominion LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Amendment)(Jayne, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Order for Admission of Scott Poynter to Bar of this Court by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Poarch, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Subpoena by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Poarch, David) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Poarch, David) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Clayton Adams, Kathryn Aitken, Robert Alexander, Sr, Robert Allen, Davinna Allensworth, Jeri Allmon, Mickey Allmon, Elaine Altom, Ardishir Amighi, Jane Louise Anderson, Leroy Anderson, Leland Annesley, Julian Ash, Dennis Atkinson, Denise Austin, J Ramon Avila, David Ball, Justin R Barker, Blake Barlow, Jim E Bean, Lisa K Bean, Kevin Beat, David Beebe, Lacheverjuan Bennett, Marca Bennett, Raymond Berlioz, Lisa Birdwell, Ricky Birdwell, Alverna Black, Earl White, Shannon White, Basil Wilcoxson, Alvina Wilks, Eric Williams, Mae Oma Williams, Robert Williams, Shannon Williams, Stewart Williams, Barron Winters, Mistie Winters, Shirley Witkowski, Kenneth Wolf, Laura Wolf, Lisa Wolf, William Wolf, Sharon Wood, William Wood, Eva Wooden, Ron Wooden, Ben Young, Lyndall Young, Shoushan Zeng, Lan Zhao, Jared Black, Neile Blackwell, Jose Luis Bosquez, Debra Brennan Brennan, Jordan Breshears, Christine Brewer, Donald Brewer, Sharon Ann Bruce, Ronald D Bryen, Sharon K Bryen, Emily Buchanan, Nathan Buchanan, Barbara Bunt, John Bunt, Allen Burke, Arnold Burkett, Cheryl A Burkett, Adam Burt, Erin Burt, Rene Buss, Shane Buss, Eleen B Caballero, Rachelle Caldwell, Robert Caldwell, Deborah Calhoun, Jerry Calhoun, Carolyn Campbell, Kenneth Campbell, Jonathan W.T. Lewis, Lisa Lewis, Lighthouse Christian Center, Edward C Lorenzen, Roland Lozier, Alexander T Lunn, Carolyn Lunn, Thomas Maassen, Virginia Lee Maguire, David Main, Louise Main, Robert Mallett, Shannon Mallett, Carla Maloy, Patrick Maloy, Lawrence Mantin, April Marler, Nancy R Maxey, Ellen Maxwell, Alvis McAffrey, Jackie McCaughtry, James McCaughtry, Gerald McCauley, Mark McCoy, Terri McCoy, Rhonda Lynn McCracken, Eugene McDaniel, Theresa McDaniel, Gary McDonald, Karen Thornbrue, Krystal Thornbrue, Ronald Thornbrue, Jesse Tischauser, Tara Tischauser, Manny Torres, Darlene Travis, Mary Travis, Robert Traylor, Heather Trent, Grover Turner, Gagelene Tyree, Laura Tyree, Scott Tyree, Sonia Vega, Dan Vogel, Greg Vollmer, James Wallace, Pam Wallace, Cynthia Ward, Keith Warrior, Willie C Washington, Angela Watson, Cleovis Watson, Shirley Weiss, Stan Weiss, Alberta Welch, George Welch, Keith H Finley, Debbie Fisher, David Flanagan, Glenda Fogleman, William Fogleman, Betty A Foster, Julia Frias, Larry Friend, Bill Fuller, Richard Fuller, Sydney Fuller, Arthur Ganther, Katherine Ganther, William Gardner, Chris Gillespie, Valma Glover, Rona Goodeagle, Misty Graham, Ronald Graham, Cynthia Graves, Lisa Griggs, John Guadalupe, Kara Hammer, Brad K Harber, Larry Harlow, Laurie Harlow, Keith Harris, Rebecca Harris, Anthony Hartz, Lauralee Hartz, Kristy Jaynes, Larry Jaynes, Carol Jensen, Gary Jones, Joy Jones, Rita D Jones, Roy Jones, Gina Jordan, Raymond Jordan, Kelly Key, Michael Key, Donald Kincaid, Eldridge H Kindle, Theresa M Kindle, Jennie Kiser, Anthony Kralik, Chrissy Kralik, Kassidy Laesch, Robert Lang, Robin A Lang, Darell Lantz, Linda Lavender, Mike Leard, Sherri Leard, Christine Leavitt, Americ Leeviraphan, Suzanne Leeviraphan, Rae Lemonier, David H Levan, Paula Levan, Lynn Harvey, Sam Harvey, Shannon Harwell, Linda Haskell, Richard Haskell, Nelson Jack Hayes, Pamela Gail Hayes, Patty Hazlewood, Mark Helberg, Raymond Henneha, Jason G Henson, Cali Hernandez, Jordan Hernandez, Beverly Hill-Wiggly, Darlene Rae Hitchcock, Matthew Hodge, Megan Hodge, Julie Holbrook, James E Horn, Janet Horn, Ediwin House, Inman House, Lovenia House, Sherry Howard, Shalyla Hudson, Dolores Jackson, James Jackson, Caron Jarvis, Brenton Jaynes, Mickey Nixon, Debra Novakowski, Jerry Novakowski, Kelly Novakowski, Richard Novakowski, Rubelman Perdomo Padilla, James L Pendley, Sr, Jeanette Pendley, Cathy Perry, Wes Perry, Darren Peters, Michael Peters, Sherri Peters, Diana Pierre, Gary Piersol, Shannon Piersol, James Pike, Marieca Pilcher, Gary Steven Pistole, Russell Ray Pollard, Mitzi Potter, Scott Potter, Sarah Pressgrove, Thomas Pressgrove, Michael Preston, Misty Dawn Pritchard, Gary Puterka, Mohammad Rahimi, Margaret Reeves, Guilidaloe Reyes, Oscar C Smart, Sr, Douglas Norman Smith, Mary H. Smith, Rebecca Smith, Rick Sparks, Shirley Sparks, James Douglas Stafford, Lisa Stafford, Brian Stanaland, Debra Stanaland, Larry Starns, Nancy Starns, Sharon Stewart, Connie Stivers, Sharon Strong, Dawne Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, David Swanson, Tim Sweatte, Daphne Talbot, Robert Talbot, Jim Tatum, Saundra Taylor, James Thomas, John Thomas, Thomas Thomas, Brandon K Thornbrue, Richard Campbell, Ronald Campbell, Charles Canning, Delores Carr, Edwin Carr, J Pat Carter, Gayle Caskey, Harold Caskey, Bradley Casper, Christie S Chacko, George N Chacko, Marcos Chavez, Dale Cheatham, Shirley Chesser, Betty Claxton, Evelyn Colbert, Harold Colbert, Shirley Coleman, Patricia Colson, James Cooke, Debra Cooper, Jennifer Lin Copper, Carol Corey, John Craig, Troy Crews, Dawn Croteau, Sam Croteau, Paul Crowl, Raven Crowl, Samuel Reynolds, Tamara Ribera, Holly Rice, Sam Rice, Staci Richmond, William Richmond, Glyn Ridgewell, Rebecca Ridgewell, Frank Riley, Kathleen Roberts, Tonda Robinson, Joe L Rodriquez, Parvin Sadeghy, Philip Sadeghy, Marsha K Sanders, Jose Santana, Sherry Sappington, Angela Schwall, John Schwall, Mangus Scott, Sr, John Secondi, Marcella Shiel, James Shiel, Sally Shupack, John Simpson, Nancy Simpson, James Skipper, Arvil E Smallwood, Vicki Smallwood, Jeremy Smart, Shannon McDonald, Jerry McGee, Meghan McGee, John Milburn, Stephanie Milburn, Matthew Miller, Rachel Miller, John Mirjanich, Shalana Robb Moad, Lauri Monetti, Scott Monetti, James R Montgomery, III, R.L. Montgomery, Eric Moore, Karen Moore, Abbas Movlai, Janice Movlai, Kimberly Moyer, Steven Moyer, Kelly Murphree, Larry Murphree, Don Neighbors, Raelene Neighbors, Evelyn Nephew, Prentiss Nephew, New Dominion LLC, Cole Newby, Teri Newby, Martha Newcomb, Witmer Daniel, Jayson Davidson, Gamm Debora, LaJuana Dennis, Greg Depew, Janice Depew, Denise Derycke, Maria Diaz- Bosquez, Clyde Dorr, Donna Dorr, James Doss, James E Doss, Grace J Dotson, Keith Dougherty, Tammy B Dougherty, Marilyn Duesterhaus, Steven Dummer, Marshall Dunlap, James Durley, Nancy J Dye, Misty B Ellerby, Mitchell C Elmore, Carol Fadaiepour, Vali Fadaiepour, Rick Farmer, Deborah Felts, G Terry Felts. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(Poarch, David) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William O. Williams III Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3729365 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission of William O. Williams III)(Holden, Steven) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Fink Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3729361 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission of Matthew J. Fink)(Holden, Steven) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles A. Hafner Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3729358 by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission of Charles A. Hafner)(Holden, Steven) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven E Holden on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa (Holden, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.'s First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Van Meir, Ellen) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court finds insufficient factual allegations to establish the existence of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended pleading within 14 days of this date to cure the deficiencies identified in this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/3/2021. (mb) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa . (Van Meir, Ellen) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/28/2021. (llg) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Stephen P. Friot recused. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/28/2021. (llg) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Orion A Strand

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. McVicker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Charles Jayne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward L. White III, PHV