This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2023 at 08:04:54 (UTC).

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Maersk Agency U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Maersk Agency U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01164

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Defendants

Maersk Agency U.S.A., Inc.

A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S

Maersk Mexico S.A. de C.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Blair Joseph Cash

Donavan Eason

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maersk Agency U.S.A., Inc. (lwb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S. (lwb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maersk Mexico S.A. de C.V. (lwb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Maersk Agency U.S.A., Inc. served on 3/24/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to C

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. This Court HEREBY extends time to file its Answers, Move or Otherwise Plead, up to and including June 13, 2023 for ALL Defendants. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/20/23. (ceo) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. This Court HEREBY extends time to file its Answers, Move or Otherwise Plead, up to and including June 13, 2023 for ALL Defendants. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/20/23. (ceo) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint)(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Maersk Agency U.S.A., Inc. served on 3/24/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maersk Mexico S.A. de C.V. (lwb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to A.P. Moller - Maersk A/S. (lwb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maersk Agency U.S.A., Inc. (lwb) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12469134) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less