This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 07:08:08 (UTC).

National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh PA et al. v. Boy Scouts of America & Delaware BSA LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh PA filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Boy Scouts of America Delaware BSA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01237

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellants

National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh PA et al.

Lexington Insurance Company

Landmark Insurance Company

The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Inc.

St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Gulf Insurance Company

Old Republic General Insurance Group

General Star Indemnity Company

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.

Arch Insurance Company

Gemini Insurance Company

D & V Claimants

Arrowood Indemnity Company

The Lujan Claimants

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Debtor

Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC

Appellees

Boy Scouts of America

Delaware BSA LLC

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Deirdre Marie Richards

Attorney at Fineman Krekstein & Harris PC

1300 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael Rosenthal

Amanda George

Blaine H. Evanson

James Hallowell

Keith R. Martorana

Mitchell A. Karlan

Richard J. Doren

Seth M. Rokosky

Susan N.K. Gummow

Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.

Louis J. Rizzo, Jr.

Attorney at Reger Rizzo & Darnall LLP

1521 Concord Pike, Brandywine Plaza West

Wilmington, DE 19803

Carl N. Kunz, III

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Sarah Michelle Ennis

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Stephen M. Miller

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Ashley L. Criss

Appellee Attorneys

Derek C. Abbott

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrew R. Remming

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Paige Noelle Topper

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell

1201 N. Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Tori Lynn Remington

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP

1201 N. Market Street, 16Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

59 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

58 #2

Certificate of Service

58 #1

Exhibit

58 #58

Main Document

57 #2

Certificate of Service

57 #57

Main Document

54 #2

Certificate of Service

54 #1

Text of Proposed Order

54 #54

Main Document

#46

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

5 #1

Exhibit A

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (apk) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit A to Order on Appeal

1 #3

Opinion on Appeal

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Main Document

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Answering Brief Deadline re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Identified in Appendix Under Seal. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2022. (nms) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) REDACTED VERSION of #46 Appendix, by D & V Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Charles) Modified on 11/15/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Notice of Filing Appendix Exhibits ADV 217-222 of Appellant D & V Claimants, by D & V Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Charles) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Identified in Appendix Under Seal, by D & V Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Charles) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI #54 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (nms) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT in the form of a thumb drive containing Appendix. Filing related to #47 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nms) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Identified in Appendix Under Seal - filed by D & V Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Charles) Modified on 11/14/2022 (nms). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Columbia Casualty Co., The Continental Insurance Co. filed by Columbia Casualty Co., The Continental Insurance Co.. (Sawczuk, Maria) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret M. Anderson, Ryan T. Schultz, Adam A. Hachikian, and Kenneth M. Thomas, filed by Old Republic General Insurance Group. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/10/2022. (nms) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret M. Anderson, Ryan T. Schultz, Adam A. Hachikian, and Kenneth M. Thomas, - filed by Old Republic General Insurance Group. (Ennis, Sarah) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Bankruptcy Court Transmittal regarding D.I. #1 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 List of Appellees to be added)(smg) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT of Issues on Appeal and Designation Of Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Landmark Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh PA et al., The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richards, Deirdre) Modified on 10/3/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORAL ORDER: A conference to discuss consolidation structure and an overall briefing schedule for the appeal is set for 10/7/2022, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/30/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 4 on 9/28/2022, has been removed from the docket. The motion was filed by a party that is not a member to this case. The captions on the filing also contained errors. The case is no longer in unassigned status and therefor requires the initials of the assigned judge after the case number. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA through 1:22-cv-01247-RGA; 1:22-cv-01249-RGA through 1:22-cv-01252-RGA, 1:22-cv-01254-RGA, 1:22-cv-01258-RGA and 1:22-cv-01263-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JOINT Motion for Consolidation and to Approve Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC - filed by Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 9/28/2022 (nms). (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (apk) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (apk) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (apk) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 9/8/2022 and Opinion entered 7/29/2022 by Judge Laurie Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343 (LSS). Fee Status Paid.- filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh PA et al. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(apk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2022: #3 Opinion on Appeal) (apk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2022: #4 Exhibit A to Order on Appeal) (apk). (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less