This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2022 at 07:35:49 (UTC).

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBURGH, PA et al v. ARTHREX, INC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2022 NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO OF PITTSBURGH, PA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARTHREX, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBURGH, PA

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ARTHREX, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron S. Weiss

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

700 Nw 1St Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33136

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against ARTHREX, INC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19442187) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Summons)(Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Deem Case No. 2:22-cv-00225 terminated and refunding the Filing Fee Paid to Open This Case by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBURGH, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pay.gov Payment Confirmation for Case No. 2:22-cv-00225, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filing for for Case No. 2:22-cv-00225, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pay.gov Payment Confirmation for Case No. 2:22-cv-00226, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Electronic Filing for for Case No. 2:22-cv-00224)(Weiss, Aaron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 04/11/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Pay.gov Payment Confirmation for Case No. 2:22-cv-00225

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filing for for Case No. 2:22-cv-00225

3 #3

Exhibit 3 - Pay.gov Payment Confirmation for Case No. 2:22-cv-00226

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketREFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-19442187 refunded in the amount of $402.00 paid to Aaron Weiss on behalf of the plaintiffs as per endorsed order signed by Judge Badalamenti on 4/18/22. (JSR) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketRemark: Sent Order 4 to Finance. (jmc) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Verified Motion to Deem Case No. 2:22-cv-225 Terminated and to Refund Filing Fee for This Case. For the reasons stated in Plaintiff's motion (Doc. 3), and noting that this case was filed in error, the Court finds good cause to DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE the matter to Plaintiff's ability to pursue its claim in Case No. 2:22-cv-226-SPC-MRM. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refund the filing fee in Case No. 2:22-cv-225-JLB-MRM, terminate any pending deadlines, and close the file. The Clerk is further directed to provide a copy of this Text Order to appropriate court personnel to process the refund. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 4/18/2022. (NM) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Deem Case No. 2:22-cv-00225 terminated and refunding the Filing Fee Paid to Open This Case by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE CO. OF PITTSBURGH, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pay.gov Payment Confirmation for Case No. 2:22-cv-00225, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Electronic Filing for for Case No. 2:22-cv-00225, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pay.gov Payment Confirmation for Case No. 2:22-cv-00226, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Electronic Filing for for Case No. 2:22-cv-00224)(Weiss, Aaron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0225-JLB-MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against ARTHREX, INC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19442187) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Summons)(Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARTHREX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Stenzler Weiss