This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2020 at 10:36:29 (UTC).

National Surety Corporation v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 National Surety Corporation filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Stanley Black Decker, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Surety Corporation

Defendants

Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. a Connecticut corporation doing business as DeWalt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph A. Wetch, Jr.

Attorney at Serkland, Lundberg, Erickson, Marcil & McLean, Ltd.

P.O. Box 6017

Fargo, ND 58108-6017

Thomas Dunford

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

707 17Th Street, Suite 3100

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Kirsten H. Tuntland

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Zachary E. Pelham

Attorney at Pearce & Durick

314 E Thayer Ave, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

Russ Ponessa

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 South Seventh Street, Ste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Russell S. Ponessa (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1978285) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Ponessa, Russ) Modified on 6/26/2020 to add receipt #. (js) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 6/26/2020 to remove text only language. Regenerated NEF(cjs). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Surety Corporation. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020 (Wetch, Joseph) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (rh) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Filing fee $400) filed by National Surety Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell S. Ponessa. (js) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Russell S. Ponessa (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1978285) by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Ponessa, Russ) Modified on 6/26/2020 to add receipt #. (js) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 6/26/2020 to remove text only language. Regenerated NEF(cjs). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Pelham, Zachary) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Surety Corporation. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020 (Wetch, Joseph) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (rh) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Filing fee $400) filed by National Surety Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirsten Tuntland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary E. Pelham