This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:15:22 (UTC).

National Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. Sanchez

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 National Staffing Solutions, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Sanchez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01590

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Staffing Solutions, Inc.

Defendant

Heidi Sanchez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Colby Losey

Attorney at Losey PLLC

1420 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Alexandria C. Dantes

Attorney at Losey PLLC

1420 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendant Attorney

Henry Clay Parker, IV

Attorney at Parker & Associates, PA

108 Hillcrest St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by National Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Losey, Adam) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER to strike re: #22 Notice of Unavailability filed by Heidi Sanchez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/19/2021. (TYI) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Heidi Sanchez. (Parker, Henry) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#22

(#22) (STRICKEN BY #24 ORDER) NOTICE by Heidi Sanchez of Unavailability (Parker, Henry) Modified on 11/22/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#20

(#20) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Heidi Sanchez. (Parker, Henry) Modified on 11/12/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#8

(#8) (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #10) NOTICE by National Staffing Solutions, Inc. re #6 Order (Losey, Adam) Modified on 10/13/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

7 #5

Exhibit E

7 #4

Exhibit D

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) PROOF of service by National Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing. See Order for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/29/2021. (AH) (RDO). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Heidi Sanchez. (RDO) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by National Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Losey, Adam) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER to strike re: #22 Notice of Unavailability filed by Heidi Sanchez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/19/2021. (TYI) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Heidi Sanchez. (Parker, Henry) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) (STRICKEN BY #24 ORDER) NOTICE by Heidi Sanchez of Unavailability (Parker, Henry) Modified on 11/22/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/reset deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (RDO) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. The parties have until November 19, 2021 to file a stipulation for the entry of preliminary injunction with the agreed upon language. The Court notes that it is bad practice to request an extension of time to file past the response deadline. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/12/2021. (AH) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Heidi Sanchez. (Parker, Henry) Modified on 11/12/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Initial Order by Heidi Sanchez. (Parker, Henry) Modified on 11/5/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Heidi Sanchez.(Parker, Henry) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/reset deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing. Responses due by 11/9/2021 (RDO) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (RDO) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by National Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Losey, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #10) NOTICE by National Staffing Solutions, Inc. re #6 Order (Losey, Adam) Modified on 10/13/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF of service by National Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/30/2021. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing. See Order for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/29/2021. (AH) (RDO). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Heidi Sanchez. (RDO) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-1590-PGB-LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing by National Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Losey, Adam) Modified on 9/29/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Heidi Sanchez with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18755975) filed by National Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant