8:21-CV-01553
06/28/2021
Disposed - Other Disposed
Contract - Other Contract
Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Christopher P. Tuite
National Sourcing Inc.
Armed Forces Services Corporation
J. Carlton Mitchell
Attorney at Older Lundy & Alvarez
1000 W. Cass St.
Tampa, FL 33606
Jon Taylor Gatto
Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA
4221 W Boy Scout Blvd, Ste. 1000
Tampa, FL 33607
Daniel William Wolff
Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw
Washington, DC 20004
Exhibit
Exhibit
State Court Other Documents State Differentiated Case Management and Notice of H
State Court Other Documents State Request for Division
State Court Other Documents State Efiled Summons Issued
State Court Other Documents State Request for Summons to be Issued
State Court Other Documents State Civil Cover Sheet
State Court Other Documents State Docket Sheet
State Court COMPLAINT State Complaint
Civil Cover Sheet
Docket(#20) 60 DAY ORDER dismissing case. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/18/2021. (BGS) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) NOTICE of settlement and MOTION to Vacate Deadlines by Armed Forces Services Corporation (Gatto, Jon) Modified event and text on 8/18/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 08/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties' case management report shall be filed on or before August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/28/2021. (CEH) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion. The deadline for the parties to conduct their initial conference is extended to and including August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/28/2021. (CEH) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Armed Forces Services Corporation. (Gatto, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 07/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's #14 Agreed Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Counterclaim. No later than August 16, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's counterclaim (Doc. #12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 7/27/2021. (CTB) (Entered: 07/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim by National Sourcing Inc. (Mitchell, J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. Modified text on 7/26/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 07/26/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Enlarge Initial Rule 16 and 26 Deadlines by National Sourcing Inc. (Mitchell, J. Modified event and text on 7/21/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 07/20/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against National Sourcing Inc. by Armed Forces Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gatto, Jon) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Daniel W. Wolff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 7/1/2021. (CTB) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by National Sourcing Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Sourcing Inc. for National Sourcing Inc. (Mitchell, J.) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 07/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Armed Forces Services Corporation. Related case(s): No (Gatto, Jon) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Sourcing Inc. Related case(s): No (Mitchell, J.) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (MCB). (Entered: 07/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Daniel W. Wolff to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18427829 for $150 by Armed Forces Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gatto, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 07/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-1553-CEH-CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Armed Forces Services Corporation. (Gatto, Jon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) NOTICE by Armed Forces Services Corporation Declaration of Maria Ayub (Gatto, Jon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 21-CA-004460 filed in State Court on 05/28/21. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18415116 filed by Armed Forces Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT State Complaint, #3 State Court Other Documents State Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents State Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents State Request for Summons to be Issued, #6 State Court Other Documents State Efiled Summons Issued, #7 State Court Other Documents State Request for Division, #8 State Court Other Documents State Differentiated Case Management and Notice of Hearing)(Gatto, Jon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
[-] Read Less