This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:31:32 (UTC).

National Public Radio, Inc. v. Klavans, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 National Public Radio, Inc filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Klavans. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02247

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Public Radio, Inc.

Defendants

GLENN L. KLAVANS

FRED S. HECKER

Hon. Glenn L. Klavans

Hon. Fred S. Hecker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles D Tobin

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Leslie Minora

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market Street 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Maxwell S. Mishkin

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1909 K Street Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Ann Marie Sheridan

Attorney at Maryland Office of the Attorney General

200 Saint Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Robert A Scott

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

200 St. Paul Place, 20Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION Re Settlement by Fred S. Hecker, Glenn L. Klavans(Scott, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER Regarding Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/14/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION re #20 Order ; PROPOSED JOINT CONSENT ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS by National Public Radio, Inc.(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER confirming the off-the-record telephone conference held today with respect to the procedural timeline of this case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/22/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#19

(#19) PERMANENT INJUNCTION MEMORANDUM ORDER; cancelling the permanent injunction hearing scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 11:00a.m. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/21/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION re #15 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Public Radio, Inc.(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/15/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; SETTING date for hearing. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Fred S. Hecker, Glenn L. Klavans.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Hon. G. Klavans

1 #3

Summons Hon. F. Hecker

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION Re Settlement by Fred S. Hecker, Glenn L. Klavans(Scott, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Regarding Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/14/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION re #20 Order ; PROPOSED JOINT CONSENT ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS by National Public Radio, Inc.(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER confirming the off-the-record telephone conference held today with respect to the procedural timeline of this case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/22/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PERMANENT INJUNCTION MEMORANDUM ORDER; cancelling the permanent injunction hearing scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 11:00a.m. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/21/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION re #15 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Public Radio, Inc.(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/13/2021, before Judge Richard D. Bennett. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary M. Zajac, Telephone number 410-962-4544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2021.(mmz, Court Reporter) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/15/2021. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; SETTING date for hearing. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2021 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Public Radio, Inc. before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Mary Zajac) (mm7s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Public Radio, Inc.. Glenn L. Klavans served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021.(Mishkin, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Public Radio, Inc.. Fred S. Hecker served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021.(Mishkin, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie Minora (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9475033.) by National Public Radio, Inc.(Mishkin, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell S. Mishkin on behalf of National Public Radio, Inc. (Mishkin, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Fred S. Hecker, Glenn L. Klavans.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (FILED IN ERROR- Not Federal Defendants) Summons Issued 60 days as to Fred S. Hecker, Glenn L. Klavans (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/2/2021 (dass, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by National Public Radio, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Decl. of C. Benderev, #3 Affidavit Decl. of K. McEvers, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Public Radio, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate NPR Foundation, Other Affiliate NPR Asset Holding Co., Inc., Other Affiliate 1111 Media Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate 1111 JW, LLC, Other Affiliate National Public Media, LLC, Other Affiliate American Coalition for Public Radio, Other Affiliate Podcast Media, LLC for National Public Radio, Inc..(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FRED S. HECKER, GLENN L. KLAVANS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9469850.), filed by National Public Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons Hon. F. Hecker, #4 Summons Hon. G. Klavans, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Public Radio, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Scott