This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:25:50 (UTC).

National Public Radio, Inc. et al v. United States Transportation Security Administration

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 National Public Radio, Inc filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Transportation Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Claude M. Hilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00556

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tim Mak

National Public Radio, Inc.

Defendant

United States Transportation Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew E. Kelley

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP (DC)

1909 K Street Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Matthew J. Mezger

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (Alexandria)

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - United States Transportation Security Administration answer due 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 06/16/20. (cmar, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States Transportation Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mezger, Matthew) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

6 #1

Notice

#6

(#6) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to United States Transportation Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tim Mak, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tim Mak, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tim Mak, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Complaint against United States Transportation Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7205958.), filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Tim Mak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - United States Transportation Security Administration answer due 7/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 06/16/20. (cmar, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States Transportation Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mezger, Matthew) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to United States Transportation Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tim Mak, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tim Mak, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tim Mak, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against United States Transportation Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7205958.), filed by National Public Radio, Inc., Tim Mak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less