This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2020 at 20:46:09 (UTC).

National Presto Industries, Inc. v. Performance Food Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 National Presto Industries, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Performance Food Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00272

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Presto Industries, Inc.

Defendants

Performance Food Group, Inc.

Ohio Pizza Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Rea Secrest

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

150 East Gay Street, Suite 2400

Columbus, OH 43215

Robert L Avers

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

350 S. Main St., Suite 300

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

John S Artz

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

350 S. Main St., Suite 300

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Andrea L Arndt

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

2600 W. Big Beaver, Suite 300

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant Attorneys

Scott J Stitt

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

175 South Third Street, Suite 520

Columbus, OH 43215

Brad R. Newberg

Attorney at McGuire Woods

1750 Tysons Boulevard, Suite 1800

Tyson, VA 22102

Amanda L DeFord

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

800 East Canal Street, Gateway Plaza

Richmond, VA 23219

Christy A Prince

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

175 S Third Street, Suit 520

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

14 #1

Memo in Support

#14

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendants Ohio Pizza Products, LLC, Performance Food Group, Inc.. Amendment to #21 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss. (Stitt, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Ohio Pizza Products, LLC, Performance Food Group, Inc.. (Stitt, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. DeFord. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/18/2019. (srb) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brad R. Newberg. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/18/2019. (srb) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ohio Pizza Products, LLC, Performance Food Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Performance Food Group, Inc. for Ohio Pizza Products, LLC.. (Prince, Christy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Performance Food Group, Inc., PFGC, Inc., Performance Food Group Company identifying Corporate Parent PFGC, Inc., Other Affiliate Performance Food Group Company for Performance Food Group, Inc... (Prince, Christy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7156498) of Amanda L. DeFord by Defendants Ohio Pizza Products, LLC, Performance Food Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stitt, Scott) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7156484) of Brad R. Newberg by Defendants Ohio Pizza Products, LLC, Performance Food Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stitt, Scott) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea L. Arndt. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 9/12/2019. (srb) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7103008) of John S. Artz by Plaintiff National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7102378) of Robert L. Avers by Plaintiff National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7102350) of Andrea L. Arndt by Plaintiff National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Ohio Pizza Products, LLC, Performance Food Group, Inc.. (kma) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Notice: If case is to be referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. (kma) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7090501), filed by National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Secrest, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL PRESTO INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Avers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan R. Secrest