This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2020 at 09:13:30 (UTC).

National Labor Relations Board v. Sunbelt Rentals Inc

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 National Labor Relations Board filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Sunbelt Rentals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William E Duffin and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00181

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William E Duffin

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Petitioner

National Labor Relations Board

Respondent

Sunbelt Rentals Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Renee M Medved

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

310 W Wisconsin Ave - Ste 700

Milwaukee, WI 53203

Tyler J Wiese

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

212 3Rd Ave S - Ste 200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Respondent Attorneys

Patricia Hill

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

50 N Laura St - Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Yash Dave

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

50 N Laura St - Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Ian Jones

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

50 N Laura St - Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) BRIEF filed by National Labor Relations Board Petitioner's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Section 10(j) Injunction. (Wiese, Tyler)

#14

(#14) BRIEF filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc re #1 Petition - Civil Case Filing, Respondent's Memorandum of Law in Opposition. (Hill, Patricia)

1 #17

Text of Proposed Order

1 #16

Text of Proposed Order

1 #15

Text of Proposed Order

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Medved, Renee)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF filed by National Labor Relations Board Petitioner's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Section 10(j) Injunction. (Wiese, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc re #1 Petition - Civil Case Filing, Respondent's Memorandum of Law in Opposition. (Hill, Patricia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/3/2020 GRANTING #13 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply Brief. (cc: all counsel) (jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Memorandum by National Labor Relations Board. (Wiese, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPENDIX by National Labor Relations Board Submitting Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A-Transcript of Administrative Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Attachment B-Petitioner Exhibits (1 of 2), #3 Exhibit Attachment C-Petitioner Exhibits (2 of 2), #4 Exhibit Attachment D-Respondent Exhibits (1 of 4), #5 Exhibit Attachment E-Respondent Exhibits (2 of 4), #6 Exhibit Attachment F-Respondent Exhibits (3 of 4), #7 Exhibit Attachment G-Respondent Exhibits (4 of 4), #8 Exhibit Attachment H-Joint Exhibit, #9 Exhibit Attachment I-Supplemental Affidavit)(Wiese, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/24/2020 GRANTING #2 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Try Petition Based on Administrative Record and Supplemental Affidavits. Respondent shall respond to the Petition by 3/5/2020; Petitioner may reply by 3/12/2020. (cc: all counsel) (jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketFILED IN ERROR NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 3 days (mlm) Modified on 2/19/2020 (mlm). Modified on 2/19/2020 (ds).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by National Labor Relations Board. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Medved, Renee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hill, Patricia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Sunbelt Rentals Inc. (Hill, Patricia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J Wiese on behalf of National Labor Relations Board. Attorney(s) appearing: Tyler J. Wiese (Wiese, Tyler)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Jones on behalf of Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ian M. Jones (Jones, Ian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Yash Dave on behalf of Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Yash B. Dave (Dave, Yash)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Hill on behalf of Sunbelt Rentals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Patricia J. Hill (Hill, Patricia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board of Petition, Proposed Orders, and Related Motion (Medved, Renee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record and Supplemental Affidavits by National Labor Relations Board. (Medved, Renee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Medved, Renee)

    Read MoreRead Less