This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:27:03 (UTC).

National Intergovernmental Purchasing Alliance Company et al v. Anderson

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 National Intergovernmental Purchasing Alliance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03589

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

National Intergovernmental Purchasing Alliance Company

Omina Partners, LLC

Defendant

Derek Anderson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Allen Rybacki

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Elise Hofer McKelvey

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (Nashville)

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Howard B. Jackson

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900, P O Box 2231

Knoxville, TN 37902-2231

Fredrick J. Bissinger

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Nashville)

214 Second Avenue, N, Suite 3

Nashville, TN 37201

Russell Daniel Cawyer

Attorney at Kelly Hart et al

201 Main Street, Ste 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Paige Pritchard Biggs

Attorney at Kelly Hart and Hallman LLP

201 Main St., Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

34 #1

Proposed Order

#34

#33

32 #1

*Restricted*

#32

#31

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #3

Attachment - Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit - State Court Filings

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by Paige P. Biggs on behalf of Derek Anderson, filed. (Biggs, Paige) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Derek Anderson, filed.(Cawyer, Russell) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Derek Anderson. Attorney Fredrick J. Bissinger and Howard B. Jackson terminated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Unopposed MOTION for Fredrick J. Bissinger and Howard B. Jackson to Withdraw as Attorney by Derek Anderson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cawyer, Russell) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Case electronically transferred in from Tennessee Middle. Case Number 3:20-cv-00493. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER: Pending before the Court are Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue for the Convenience of Parties and Witnesses (Doc. No. 6); Plaintiff's Response (Doc. No. 19); and Defendant's Reply (Doc. No. 24). For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motion (Doc. No. 6) is GRANTED in part, and DENIED, in part. Accordingly, this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and/or for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. No. 8) is left for consideration by the transferee court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/19/2020. (am) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/19/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/19/2020) (am). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER: Bench Trial set for 4/26/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Exhibit List due by 4/11/2022. Witness List due by 4/11/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2022. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 1/8/2021. Discovery due by 6/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/7/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Derek Anderson. (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF filed by Derek Anderson re #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Derek Anderson. (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick J. Bissinger on behalf of Derek Anderson (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Russell Cawyer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/6/2020. (am) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketState Bar status verified as active for (TN) Fredrick J. Bissinger, (TX)Russell Cawyer, (TN) Timothy Allen Rybacki. (am) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Derek Anderson from Williamson County Chancery Court, case number 49428B. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3157384) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - State Court Filings, #3 Attachment - Declaration)(am) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy A Rybacki

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise Hofer McKelvey