This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2020 at 09:27:00 (UTC).

National Black Farmers Association v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 National Black Farmers Association filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette A. Baker and Stephen R. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01145

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nannette A. Baker

Stephen R. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Black Farmers Association

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric F Citron

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN AND RUSSELL PC

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Christopher L. Schnieders

Attorney at NAPOLI SHKOLNIK PLLC - Overland Park

6731 W. 121St St., Suite 201

Overland Park, KS 66209

Thomas Goldstein

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN AND RUSSELL PC

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Defendant Attorneys

Booker T. Shaw

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 2700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Jeffrey Wilkerson

Attorney at WINSTON AND STRAWN LLP - Charlotte

300 S. Tryon St., 16Th Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

John J. Rosenthal

Attorney at WINSTON AND STRAWN LLP - DC

1400 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-3502

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#20

#18

17 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#17

16 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#16

#15

#12

#4

3 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing

#3

2 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing

#2

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketJudge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CBL) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Text ORDER: The Court GRANTS #20 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading in Excess of Page Limitations. Pleading must include a table of contents and table of authorities, pursuant to the undersigned's Judges Requirements. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/16/20. (JAB) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Shaw, Booker) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Wilkerson. #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Rosenthal. filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/6/2020. (CLO) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Monsanto Company. Parent companies: Bayer AG, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: Bayer AG,. (Shaw, Booker) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Wilkerson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8166493) by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John J. Rosenthal. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8166473) by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenthal, John) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff National Black Farmers Association. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Schnieders, Christopher) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, Booker) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Monsanto Company answer due 10/26/2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/22/20. (JAB) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#13) Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant Monsanto Company, Plaintiff National Black Farmers Association. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/28/2020. (JAB) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney Eric F. Citron's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. [Doc. 3.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on August 27, 2020. (JMR) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney Thomas C. Goldstein's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. [Doc. 2.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on August 27, 2020. (JMR) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/5/2020. (EAB) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJudge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (EAB) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Christopher L. Schnieders. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff National Black Farmers Association Process Server: PM Legal, LLC (BAK) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric F. Citron. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8101711) by Plaintiff National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Citron, Eric) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas C. Goldstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8101448) by Plaintiff National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldstein, Thomas) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT 4:20-CV-1145 against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-8101352, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by National Black Farmers Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons )(Schnieders, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #3 Original Filing Form) (BAK). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J. Rosenthal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Booker T Shaw