National Association of Manufacturers et al v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15324942), filed by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Gary Gensler. (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Patrick D. Hedren. (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Andrew A. Lyons-Berg. (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Erica T. Klenicki (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Paul W. Hughes. (jb3) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. United States Securities and Exchange Commission served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. Gary Gensler served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debbie E. Green on behalf of Paul W. Hughes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15350168) by on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debbie E. Green on behalf of Andrew A. Lyons-Berg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15350248) by on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Paul W. Hughes' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Hughes has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Andrew A. Lyons-Berg's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Lyons-Berg has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by B. David Fraser on behalf of Gary Gensler, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney B. David Fraser added to party Gary Gensler(pty:dft), Attorney B. David Fraser added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:dft) (Fraser, B.) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by B. David Fraser Daniel Matro by on behalf of Gary Gensler, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Fraser, B.) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by B. David Fraser Tracey A. Hardin by on behalf of Gary Gensler, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Fraser, B.) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Daniel Matro's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Matro has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Tracey A. Hardin's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Hardin has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debbie E. Green on behalf of Erica T. Klenicki ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15361852) by on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debbie E. Green on behalf of Patrick Hedren ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15362113) by on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Green, Debbie) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #19 Erica T. Klenicki's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Klenicki has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #20 Patrick D. Hedren's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Hedren has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Summary Judgment by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Hughes Decl. Ex. A, #3 Hughes Decl. Ex. B, #4 Hughes Decl. Ex. C, #5 Declaration of Christopher Netram, #6 Netram Decl. Ex. A, #7 Netram Decl. Ex. B, #8 Netram Decl. Ex. C, #9 Netram Decl. Ex. D, #10 Netram Decl. Ex. E, #11 Netram Decl. Ex. F, #12 Netram Decl. Ex. G, #13 Netram Decl. Ex. H, #14 Netram Decl. Ex. I, #15 Netram Decl. Ex. J, #16 Netram Decl. Ex. K, #17 Netram Decl. Ex. L, #18 Netram Decl. Ex. M, #19 Netram Decl. Ex. N, #20 Netram Decl. Ex. O, #21 Netram Decl. Ex. P, #22 Declaration of Stephen C. Taylor, #23 Taylor Decl. Ex. A, #24 Taylor Decl. Ex. B, #25 Taylor Decl. Ex. C, #26 Taylor Decl. Ex. D, #27 Taylor Decl. Ex. E, #28 Taylor Decl. Ex. F, #29 Taylor Decl. Ex. G). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joint MOTION to establish a briefing schedule re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING #22 Joint Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keefe Bernstein on behalf of Gary Gensler, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney Keefe Bernstein added to party Gary Gensler(pty:dft), Attorney Keefe Bernstein added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:dft) (Bernstein, Keefe) (Main Document 24 replaced on 11/19/2021- replaced document with flattened copy) (jb3). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gary Gensler, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Matro, #2 Matro Decl. Ex. 1, #3 Matro Decl. Ex. 2). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Matro, Daniel) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Gary Gensler, United States Securities and Exchange Commission, re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff National Association of Manufacturers, Plaintiff Natural Gas Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Matro, #2 Matro Decl. Ex. 1, #3 Matro Decl. Ex. 2)(Matro, Daniel) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Dan M. Berkovitz. (jb3) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Daniel E. Matro. (jb3) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less