This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2022 at 08:41:19 (UTC).

National Association For Gun Rights, Inc. et al v. Robert Bonta

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 National Association For Gun Rights, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Robert Bonta. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04543

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.

Ronald Givens

Defendants

Robert Bonta

Does 1-25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harmeet Dhillon

Mark P. Meuser

Michael Andrew Columbo

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33570176 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs National Association For Gun Rights, Inc., Ronald Givens. (Attorney Harmeet Dhillon added to party Ronald Givens(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet Dhillon added to party National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Givens, National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Givens, National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David A Warrington on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gary M Lawkowski on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#11

(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Givens, National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#12

(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Robert Bonta. (aco) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#14

(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Robert Bonta, Does amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs National Association For Gun Rights, Inc., Ronald Givens(Columbo, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Robert Bonta, Does amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs National Association For Gun Rights, Inc., Ronald Givens(Columbo, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Robert Bonta. (aco) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Givens, National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gary M Lawkowski on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David A Warrington on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Givens, National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ronald Givens, National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33570176 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs National Association For Gun Rights, Inc., Ronald Givens. (Attorney Harmeet Dhillon added to party Ronald Givens(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet Dhillon added to party National Association For Gun Rights, Inc.(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less