This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 08:08:32 (UTC).

Natera, Inc. v. CareDx, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Natera, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CareDx, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00642

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natera, Inc.

Defendant

CareDx, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Anthony David Raucci

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Derek James Fahnestock

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorney

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-J

1 #2

Exhibit K, Part 1

1 #3

Exhibit K, Part 2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,111,544 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Natera, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to CareDx, Inc. on 5/13/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natera, Inc.. CareDx, Inc. served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Natera, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Damages Model - filed by Natera, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaints to 7/6/2022 - filed by CareDx, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Natera, Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) - filed by Natera, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#10

(#10) Proposed STIPULATION and Order Regarding Case Consolidation by Natera, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#11

(#11) SO ORDERED, re (44 in 1:20-cv-00038-CFC-CJB, 10 in 1:22-cv-00641-CFC, 10 in 1:22-cv-00642-CFC) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE CONSOLIDATION AND SCHEDULING. 20-38-CFC SHALL BE THE LEAD CASE AND ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-38-CFC. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Joinder of Parties due by 12/23/2022., Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2022., Fact Discovery completed by 2/17/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2023., Answering Brief due 9/8/2023., Reply Brief due 9/22/2023., Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/9/2022., A Markman Hearing is set for 12/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/9/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly., A Jury Trial is set for 1/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/15/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00038-CFC-CJB, 1:22-cv-00641-CFC, 1:22-cv-00642-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-00038-CFC-CJB. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-38-CFC ONLY. (nmf) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SO ORDERED, re (44 in 1:20-cv-00038-CFC-CJB, 10 in 1:22-cv-00641-CFC, 10 in 1:22-cv-00642-CFC) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE CONSOLIDATION AND SCHEDULING. 20-38-CFC SHALL BE THE LEAD CASE AND ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-38-CFC. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Joinder of Parties due by 12/23/2022., Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2022., Fact Discovery completed by 2/17/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2023., Answering Brief due 9/8/2023., Reply Brief due 9/22/2023., Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/9/2022., A Markman Hearing is set for 12/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/9/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly., A Jury Trial is set for 1/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/15/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00038-CFC-CJB, 1:22-cv-00641-CFC, 1:22-cv-00642-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed STIPULATION and Order Regarding Case Consolidation by Natera, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Natera, Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) - filed by Natera, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaints to 7/6/2022, filed by CareDx, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: CareDx, Inc. answer due 7/6/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/6/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaints to 7/6/2022 - filed by CareDx, Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Natera, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Damages Model - filed by Natera, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natera, Inc.. CareDx, Inc. served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Fahnestock, Derek) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to CareDx, Inc. on 5/13/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Natera, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,111,544 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against CareDx, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3873648.) - filed by Natera, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Exhibit K, Part 1, #3 Exhibit K, Part 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CareDx, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Natera, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Farnan