This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2021 at 08:54:42 (UTC).

Nataly Morales v. Royce Confect USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Nataly Morales filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Royce Confect USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08478

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nataly Morales

Defendants

Royce Confect USA, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Binyamin I Manoucheri

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wislhire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jasmine Behroozan

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Samantha Leigh Squillante

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer LLP

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 1050

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22), #16 . (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Granting #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Royce Confect USA, Inc. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 2/21/2022. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Filer erroneously set application for hearing on 1/3/22 9:00 AM, which does not appear on the pdf document, nor is a hearing required. Therefore, clerk has TERMED only this erroneous hearing. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer prepared own proposed order. However the proposed order includes" hearing held", which is incorrect and is missing information required/and or is not verbatim to the court's official corresponding ADA proposed order form. FIler can obtain the form on the court's webside.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order GRANTING ADA DISABILITY ACCESS LITIGATION: APPLICATION FOR STAY A

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Filer erroneously set hearing before Magistrate Judge for 12/23/21 10:00 AM. No such hearing appears on the pdf document, nor is a hearing required. MISSING PROPOSED ORDER form which is to be submitted to the Judge Scarsi. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#12

(#12) First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 12/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attorney Samantha Leigh Squillante added to party Royce Confect USA, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Squillante, Samantha) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales, upon Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ken Romaniszyn, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (vv) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (vv) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nataly Morales, (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22), #16 . (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Granting #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Royce Confect USA, Inc. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 2/21/2022. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Filer erroneously set application for hearing on 1/3/22 9:00 AM, which does not appear on the pdf document, nor is a hearing required. Therefore, clerk has TERMED only this erroneous hearing. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer prepared own proposed order. However the proposed order includes" hearing held", which is incorrect and is missing information required/and or is not verbatim to the court's official corresponding ADA proposed order form. FIler can obtain the form on the court's webside.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 1/3/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING ADA DISABILITY ACCESS LITIGATION: APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY MEDIATION) (Squillante, Samantha) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Filer erroneously set hearing before Magistrate Judge for 12/23/21 10:00 AM. No such hearing appears on the pdf document, nor is a hearing required. MISSING PROPOSED ORDER form which is to be submitted to the Judge Scarsi. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc.. Application set for hearing on 12/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attorney Samantha Leigh Squillante added to party Royce Confect USA, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Squillante, Samantha) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales, upon Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc. served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ken Romaniszyn, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (vv) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (vv) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Royce Confect USA, Inc. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nataly Morales, (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32220713 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Nataly Morales(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less