This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2022 at 09:28:33 (UTC).

Nataly Morales v. Argamaan, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Nataly Morales filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Argamaan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08880

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nataly Morales

Defendants

ARGAMAAN, INC. d/b/a ITALY 2000

Argamaan, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Italy 2000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Binyamin I Manoucheri

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wislhire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On 12/14/2021, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #11 . Upon due consideration, the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice as to Plaintiff's individual claims. Each party must bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Nataly Morales. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales, upon Defendant Argamaan, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kosrow Matian, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Argamaan, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales, identifying ARGAMAAN, INC. d/b/a ITALY 2000, a California corporation. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32310632 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Nataly Morales. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Nataly Morales(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARGAMAAN INC DBA ITALY 2000 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Binyamin I Manoucheri

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiago M. Coelho