Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:40:40 (UTC).

Natalie Grumet v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Natalie Grumet filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01537

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalie Grumet

Defendants

Life Insurance Company of North America

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott E Calvert

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael B Horrow

Attorney at Donahue and Horrow LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 22, 2020. (gga) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying (1) Plaintiff Natalie Grumet; and (2) Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #4

Proof of Service

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01148760-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27702278 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 22, 2020. (gga) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Natalie Grumet, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 7/22/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Life Insurance Company of North America, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Natalie Grumet. (filed in state court 6/19/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying (1) Plaintiff Natalie Grumet; and (2) Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01148760-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27702278 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Calvert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Brian Horrow