This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 07:41:58 (UTC).

Nastasia v. NIMA, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Nastasia filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NIMA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01712

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Nastasia

Defendant

NIMA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Zarcone

Attorney at Winner & Sherrod

1117 South Rancho Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Raymond R. Aranza

11240 Davenport St.

Omaha, NE 68154

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Victor Nastasia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zarcone, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to NIMA, LLC. (JM) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Victor Nastasia. (Zarcone, Justin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NIMA, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5722802) by Victor Nastasia. Proof of service due by 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Zarcone, Justin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Victor Nastasia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zarcone, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to NIMA, LLC. (JM) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Victor Nastasia. (Zarcone, Justin) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Raymond R. Aranza to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/16/2019. (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NIMA, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5722802) by Victor Nastasia. Proof of service due by 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Zarcone, Justin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less