This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 13:23:53 (UTC).

Nasser v. Caris Life Sciences Incorporated

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Nasser filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Caris Life Sciences Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02455

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enayatullah Nasser

San Antonio, TX 78218

Defendant

Caris Life Sciences Incorporated

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on March 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/04/2021. (REK) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/04/2021. (REK) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/04/2021. (REK) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Caris Life Sciences Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX224902. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02455-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Enayatullah Nasser. (REK) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number PHX224902 filed by Enayatullah Nasser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caris Life Sciences Ltd is a litigant