This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:25:50 (UTC).

Nasir & Associates, LLC v. Tutor Perini Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Nasir Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tutor Perini Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02375

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nasir & Associates, LLC

Defendant

Tutor Perini Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Joseph Pierce

Attorney at Rees Broome PC

1900 Gallows Road, Suite 700

Tysons Corner, VA 22182

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nasir & Associates, LLC (Pierce, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nasir & Associates, LLC. Tutor Perini Corporation served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Pierce, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Tutor Perini Corporation.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #6

Summons for Tutor Perini Corp

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Ex 4 (Inv. 4104596)

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3 (Inv. 4104402)

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 (Invoice 4104282)

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 (Purchase Order)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8812418.), filed by Nasir & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Purchase Order), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Invoice 4104282), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Inv. 4104402), #4 Exhibit Ex 4 (Inv. 4104596), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons for Tutor Perini Corp)(Pierce, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nasir & Associates, LLC (Pierce, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nasir & Associates, LLC. Tutor Perini Corporation served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(Pierce, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Tutor Perini Corporation.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8812418.), filed by Nasir & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Purchase Order), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Invoice 4104282), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Inv. 4104402), #4 Exhibit Ex 4 (Inv. 4104596), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons for Tutor Perini Corp)(Pierce, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less