This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 08:51:11 (UTC).

Nash v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Nash filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Beth Deere. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Nash

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Lynn Coleman

Attorney at Coleman Law Firm

Post Office Box 25

Cave Springs, AR 72718

Defendant Attorney

Stacey Elise McCord

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/19/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Ms. Nash's counsel to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/19/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Nash re #4 Certificate of Service Return Receipt - OGC (Coleman, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Nash re #4 Certificate of Service Return Receipt - USDA (Coleman, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Nash (Coleman, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Ms. Nash's counsel to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Patricia Nash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Nash. (jbh) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less