This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 10:48:35 (UTC).

Nasgovitz v. Waldorf University

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Nasgovitz filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Waldorf University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03008

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savanna Nasgovitz

Defendant

Waldorf University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jill M Zwagerman

Attorney at Newkirk Zwagerman PLC

515 E. Locust, Suite 300

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca E Reif

Attorney at Ahlers & Cooney, P.C.

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

Rebecca Elizabeth Reif

Attorney at Ahlers & Cooney, P.C.

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

Emily Ann Kolbe

Attorney at Ahlers & Cooney

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

5 #2

*Restricted*

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court: This case shall be remanded back to the Iowa District Court for Winnebago County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/17/2021. (Certified Copy to Winnebago County via certified mail) (kms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2021: #2 Certified Mail Receipt Returned) (sgw). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

4 #1

Brief

#4

(#4) UNRESISTED MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Waldorf University Responses due by 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 4/14/2021. (mmc) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Savanna Nasgovitz. (mmc) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #2

Local Rule 81(a) List on Removal

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Winnebago County, case number CVCV018140. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3407501), filed by Waldorf University. Scheduling Report due by 5/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Rule 81(a) List on Removal) (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court: This case shall be remanded back to the Iowa District Court for Winnebago County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/17/2021. (Certified Copy to Winnebago County via certified mail) (kms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2021: #2 Certified Mail Receipt Returned) (sgw). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) UNRESISTED MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Waldorf University Responses due by 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/5/2021. (mmc) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 4/14/2021. (mmc) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Savanna Nasgovitz. (mmc) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Winnebago County, case number CVCV018140. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3407501), filed by Waldorf University. Scheduling Report due by 5/11/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Rule 81(a) List on Removal) (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily A. Kolbe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Elizabeth Reif(Designation Retained)