This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 07:25:03 (UTC).

NASE v. COOK GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 NASE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02901

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAY NASE

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP, INC.

COOK MEDICAL INC.

COOK MEDICAL, LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC.

COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES

COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS

COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS

COOK GROUP EUROPE APS

COOK NEDERLAND BV

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL A. GALPERN

Attorney at JAVERGAUM WURGAFT HICKS KAHN WIKSTROM SININS PC

1000 Haddonfield Berlin Rd, Suite 203

Voorhees, NJ 08043

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, COOK NEDERLAND BV, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (rf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 USC 1407 TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF 10/15/14 AND WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD L. YOUNG, PURSUANT TO MDL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 2570) (rf, ) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA VIA CM/ECF ELECTRONIC CASE TRANSFER (rf, ) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 USC 1407 TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF 10/15/14 AND WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD L. YOUNG, PURSUANT TO MDL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 2570) (rf, ) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, COOK NEDERLAND BV, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (rf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16063879.), filed by FAY NASE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GALPERN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant