This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 09:08:55 (UTC).

Nascimento v. Fason et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Nascimento filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Fason. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02605

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Nascimento

Defendants

Gregory Fason

Jeffrey Abeare

John Doe

Gregory Howerton

David Phillip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Roberts

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Pkwysuite 540

Addison, TX 75001

Scott H Palmer

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Parkwaysuite 540 Lb 32

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsay Erin Wilson Gowin

Attorney at Dallas City Attorney's Office

1500 Marilla Streetroom 7Bn

Dallas, TX 75201

Devin Quaalon Alexander

Attorney at Dallas City Attorney's Office

1500 Marilla Street, #7Dn

Dallas, TX 75201

John Cheves Ligon

Attorney at Dallas City Attorney's Office

1500 Marilla Street

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Abeare, John Doe, Gregory Fason. (ndt) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jeffrey Abeare Attorney Lindsay Erin Wilson Gowin added to party Jeffrey Abeare(pty:dft) (Wilson Gowin, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Gregory Fason filed by Carlos Nascimento. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Gregory Howerton, David Phillip. (axm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gregory Fason. Waiver sent on 11/23/2021; Gregory Howerton. Waiver sent on 11/23/2021; David Phillip. Waiver sent on 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

9 #1

Additional Page(s)

9 #2

Additional Page(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gregory Fason. Waiver sent on 11/23/2021; Gregory Howerton. Waiver sent on 11/23/2021; David Phillip. Waiver sent on 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Gregory Howerton, David Phillip. (axm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Gregory Fason filed by Carlos Nascimento. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***DISREGARD/ENTERED IN ERROR***Answer due from Jeffrey Abeares on 11/23/2021 per 6 Order (ykp) Modified on 11/15/2021 (ykp). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Response. Defendant Jeffrey Abeares response to the complaint is due November 23, 2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/15/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jeffrey Abeare Attorney Lindsay Erin Wilson Gowin added to party Jeffrey Abeare(pty:dft) (Wilson Gowin, Lindsay) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Abeare, John Doe, Gregory Fason. (ndt) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carlos Nascimento. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Carlos Nascimento. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12317577) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less