This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2021 at 11:28:04 (UTC).

Narvaez v. WebMD LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Narvaez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WebMD LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02305

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Narvaez

Defendants

Mouseflow, Inc.

WebMD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Dashiell Smith

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Blvd., Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Ana Tagvoryan

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Julianna Simon

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Harrison Maxwell Brown

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Jaeger

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Zoe K. Wilhelm

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/21/2020 ORDERING Mouseflow, Inc. to file response to complaint on or before 2/4/2021. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/17/20 ORDERING that WebMD LLC shall file its response to the Complaint in this action on or before February 4, 2021. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Zoe K. Wilhelm on behalf of WebMD LLC. Attorney Wilhelm, Zoe K. added. (Wilhelm, Zoe) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julianna Simon on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Simon, Julianna added. (Simon, Julianna) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Harrison Maxwell Brown on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Brown, Harrison Maxwell added. (Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond re #1 Complaint by Mouseflow, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tagvoryan, Ana) Modified on 12/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WebMD LLC. (Jaeger, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend WebMD LLC's Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by WebMD LLC. Attorney Jaeger, Michael added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaeger, Michael) Modified on 12/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mouseflow, Inc., WebMD LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Dashiell Smith* *Bursor & Fisher, P.A.* *1990 North California Blvd., Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mouseflow, Inc., WebMD LLC by Mary Narvaez. Attorney Smith, Joel Dashiell added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9253660) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Zoe K. Wilhelm on behalf of WebMD LLC. Attorney Wilhelm, Zoe K. added. (Wilhelm, Zoe) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/21/2020 ORDERING Mouseflow, Inc. to file response to complaint on or before 2/4/2021. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julianna Simon on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Simon, Julianna added. (Simon, Julianna) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Harrison Maxwell Brown on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Brown, Harrison Maxwell added. (Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond re #1 Complaint by Mouseflow, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tagvoryan, Ana) Modified on 12/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Ana) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ana Tagvoryan on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Tagvoryan, Ana added. (Tagvoryan, Ana) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/17/20 ORDERING that WebMD LLC shall file its response to the Complaint in this action on or before February 4, 2021. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WebMD LLC. (Jaeger, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend WebMD LLC's Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by WebMD LLC. Attorney Jaeger, Michael added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaeger, Michael) Modified on 12/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Mouseflow, Inc., WebMD LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Dashiell Smith* *Bursor & Fisher, P.A.* *1990 North California Blvd., Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mouseflow, Inc., WebMD LLC by Mary Narvaez. Attorney Smith, Joel Dashiell added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9253660) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mouseflow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WEBMD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Dashiell Smith