This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2021 at 09:36:50 (UTC).

Nart Appliance LLC et. al. v. NorGUARD Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Nart Appliance LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against NorGUARD Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06336

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

No More Bon Bons Realty, LLC

Nart Appliance LLC

Defendant

NorGUARD Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gayle Sharon Gerson

Attorney at SilvermanAcampora LLP

100 Jericho Quadrangle, Suite 300

Jericho, NY 11753

Anthony C. Acampora

Attorney at Silverman Acampora LLP

100 Jericho Quadrangle, Suite 300

Jericho, NY 11753

Defendant Attorney

Yale Howard Glazer

Attorney at Lazare Potter Giacovas & Moyle LLP

747 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Nart Appliance LLC, No More Bon Bons Realty, LLC. (Gerson, Gayle) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Nart Appliance LLC, No More Bon Bons Realty, LLC. (Gerson, Gayle) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle Sharon Gerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gerson, Gayle) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by NorGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NorGUARD Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGuard Insurance Company for NorGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale) Modified on 12/30/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NorGUARD Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 612747/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13908284). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Glazer, Yale) Modified on 12/30/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The joint motion #8 to adjourn the pre-motion conference is GRANTED. The pre-motion conference is adjourned to 1:00 p.m. on February 19, 2021. The parties are directed to use the following conference line and dial-in information: toll free number 1-888-684-8852; access code 1537693. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 2/11/2021. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Nart Appliance LLC, No More Bon Bons Realty, LLC. (Gerson, Gayle) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Defendant's motion for a pre-motion conference #5 is GRANTED. A pre-motion conference on Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss shall be held on February 19, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to use the following conference line and dial-in information: toll free number 1-888-684-8852; access code 1537693. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 1/19/2021. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Nart Appliance LLC, No More Bon Bons Realty, LLC. (Gerson, Gayle) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle Sharon Gerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gerson, Gayle) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by NorGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NorGUARD Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGuard Insurance Company for NorGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale) Modified on 12/30/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NorGUARD Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 612747/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13908284). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Glazer, Yale) Modified on 12/30/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yale Howard Glazer